PRIME STEAKHOUSE v. MOWI ASA et al
Plaintiff: Prime Steakhouse
Defendant: Ocean Quality Premium Brands, Inc., Scottish Sea Farms Ltd., Marine Harvest Canada Inc., MOWI ASA, SalMar ASA, Ocean Quality North America Inc., Bremnes Seashore AS, Leroy Seafood Group ASA, Grieg Seafood ASA, Marine Harvest USA, LLC, Grieg Seafood BC Ltd., Ocean Quality AS, Ocean Quality USA Inc., Ducktrap River of Maine LLC and Leroy Seafood USA Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv21463
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Darrin P Gayles
Referring Judge: Rodney Smith
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:0001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2020 Filing 96 Clerks Notice to Filer re #95 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Document and Case Style Do Not Match; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - The Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then refile the document with the correct case style and case number in the appropriate case. (jas)
May 14, 2020 Filing 95 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SalMar ASA identifying Corporate Parent Kverva Industrier AS for SalMar ASA Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-22128-RS, 1:20-cv-21463-RS(Schwartz, Adam)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 94 PAPERLESS ORDER striking #91 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Adam Zapala. See DE 92 , #93 . Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 4/30/2020. (dco)
April 27, 2020 Filing 93 NOTICE of Striking #91 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Adam Zapala. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # BFLSDC-12800314 filed by Prime Steakhouse, PORTLAND HUNT-ALPINE CLUB LLC by Prime Steakhouse (Dubbin, Samuel) re 92 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney, Modified text on 4/30/2020 (jas).
April 27, 2020 Filing 92 Clerks Notice to Filer re #91 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Adam Zapala. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # BFLSDC-12800314. Document and Case Style Do Not Match; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - The Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then refile the document with the correct case style and case number in the appropriate case. (jas)
April 27, 2020 Filing 91 STRICKEN per DE# 94 , MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Adam Zapala. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # FLSDC-12800314 by Prime Steakhouse, PORTLAND HUNT-ALPINE CLUB LLC. Responses due by 5/11/2020 Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-22128-RS, 1:20-cv-21463-RS(Dubbin, Samuel) Modified text on 4/30/2020 (jas).
April 20, 2020 Cases associated. Per DE#90 ORDER (ebz)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES. The Clerk of the Court is directed to CONSOLIDATE the above-captioned matter with the case Wood Mountain, LLC v. Mowi ASA, No. 19-22128-CIV-SMITH (S.D. Fla. May 24, 2019). All subsequent filings shall be in that numbered-case only and bear Case No. 19-22128-CIV-SMITH. The Clerk of the Court is directed to CLOSE the above-captioned matter for administrative purposes. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 4/18/2020. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 89 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #87 Motion for Substitution of Counsel. Lawrence D. Silverman of the law firm of Akerman LLP shall serve as counsel of record for Marine Harvest USA, LLC and Ducktrap River of Maine LLC. Kristin Michelle Racine and Rebecca Gray Klotzle of Curtis Thaxter, LLC are hereby TERMINATED as counsel of record for Defendants Marine Harvest USA, LLC and Ducktrap River of Maine, and shall have no further obligations in this matter. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 4/17/2020. (dco)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 88 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #86 Motion for Substitution of Counsel. Sara Salem of the law firm of Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer US LLP, shall serve as counsel of record for Defendants Ocean Quality USA, Inc., Ocean Quality Premium Brands, Inc., and Grieg Seafood BC Ltd. Kasia S. Park of Drummond Woodsum of the law firm of Drummond Woodsum is hereby TERMINATED as counsel of record for Ocean Quality USA, Inc., Ocean Quality Premium Brands, Inc., and Grieg Seafood BC Ltd., and shall have no further obligations in this matter. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 4/17/2020. (dco)
April 17, 2020 Filing 87 Unopposed STIPULATED MOTION for Substitution of Counsel. Substituting Lawrence D.Silverman for Kristin Michelle Racine and Rebecca Gray Klotzle of Curtis Thaxter, LLC by Ducktrap River of Maine LLC, Marine Harvest Canada Inc., Marine Harvest USA, LLC. Responses due by 5/1/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Substitution of Counsel)(Silverman, Lawrence)
April 17, 2020 Filing 86 Renewed STIPULATED MOTION for Substitution of Counsel. Substituting Sara Salem for Kasia S. Park by Grieg Seafood BC Ltd., Ocean Quality Premium Brands, Inc., Ocean Quality USA Inc.. Responses due by 5/1/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Salem, Sara)
April 17, 2020 Filing 85 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lawrence Dean Silverman on behalf of Ducktrap River of Maine LLC, Marine Harvest Canada Inc., Marine Harvest USA, LLC. Attorney Lawrence Dean Silverman added to party Ducktrap River of Maine LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Lawrence Dean Silverman added to party Marine Harvest Canada Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Lawrence Dean Silverman added to party Marine Harvest USA, LLC(pty:dft). (Silverman, Lawrence)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 84 PAPERLESS ORDER denying without prejudice #80 Motion for Substitution of Counsel for failure to comply with Local Rule 7.1(a)(3). Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 4/16/2020. (dco)
April 16, 2020 Filing 83 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Carl Seipp, Jr on behalf of Leroy Seafood USA Inc.. Attorney John Carl Seipp, Jr added to party Leroy Seafood USA Inc.(pty:dft). (Seipp, John)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Judge Rodney Smith for all further proceedings, accepted and signed on 4/14/2020. Judge Darrin P. Gayles no longer assigned to case Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 4/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
April 13, 2020 Filing 81 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Leroy Seafood USA Inc.. Attorney Christine L. Welstead added to party Leroy Seafood USA Inc.(pty:dft). (Welstead, Christine)
April 10, 2020 Filing 80 UNSTIPULATED MOTION for Substitution of Counsel. Substituting Sara Salem for Kasia S. Park by Grieg Seafood BC Ltd., Ocean Quality Premium Brands, Inc., Ocean Quality USA Inc.. Responses due by 4/24/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Salem, Sara)
April 10, 2020 Filing 79 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Samuel Johnathan Dubbin on behalf of Prime Steakhouse. Attorney Samuel Johnathan Dubbin added to party Prime Steakhouse(pty:pla). (Dubbin, Samuel)
April 10, 2020 Filing 78 NOTICE of Filing re copies of documents originally submitted to USDC Maine on 4/9/2020 re service of process for SalMar ASA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return, #2 Exhibit Request) (bb)
April 9, 2020 Filing 77 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sara Leann Salem on behalf of Grieg Seafood BC Ltd., Ocean Quality Premium Brands, Inc., Ocean Quality USA Inc.. Attorney Sara Leann Salem added to party Grieg Seafood BC Ltd.(pty:dft), Attorney Sara Leann Salem added to party Ocean Quality Premium Brands, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Sara Leann Salem added to party Ocean Quality USA Inc.(pty:dft). (Salem, Sara)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 76 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #75 Motion for Substitution of Counsel. Adam L. Schwartz of the law firm of Homer Bonner Jacobs Ortiz, P.A., shall serve as counsel for record for Defendants SalMar ASA and Scottish Sea Farms Ltd. Stacy O. Stitham of the law firm of Brann and Isaacson is hereby TERMINATED as counsel of record for SalMar ASA and Scottish Sea Farms Ltd., and shall have no further obligations in this matter. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01)
April 7, 2020 Filing 75 UNSTIPULATED MOTION for Substitution of Counsel. Substituting Adam L. Schwartz for Stacy O. Stitham by SalMar ASA, Scottish Sea Farms Ltd.. Responses due by 4/21/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schwartz, Adam)
April 7, 2020 Filing 74 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam Louis Schwartz on behalf of SalMar ASA, Scottish Sea Farms Ltd.. Attorney Adam Louis Schwartz added to party SalMar ASA(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Louis Schwartz added to party Scottish Sea Farms Ltd.(pty:dft). (Schwartz, Adam)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Paperless Order. On or before April 13, 2020, the parties shall notify the Court whether this action is related to Case No. 19-cv-22128-RS. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01)
April 6, 2020 Filing 72 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Alec Blaine Finley, Jr., Jonathan W. Cuneo, Taylor Andrew Asen, Karen Hoffman Lent, Rebecca G. Klotzle, Kristin Michelle Racine, Kasia S. Park, Stacy O. Stitham, Braden Alexander Beard, David G. Webbert, Paul M. Eckles, mailing date 04/06/2020. (cco)
April 6, 2020 Filing 71 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (bb)
April 6, 2020 Filing 70 Case transferred in from Maine; Case Number 2:19-cv-00207. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(bb).
March 25, 2020 Filing 69 Interdistrict transfer to Southern District of Florida. (jgd)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER AFFIRMING RECOMMENDED DECISION ON MOTION TO TRANSER VENUE accepting #55 Report and Recommended Decision; granting #29 Motion to Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by OCEAN QUALITY PREMIUM BRANDS INC, OCEAN QUALITY USA INC, LEROY SEAFOOD USA INC; mooting #14 Motion for Approval of Plan for Alternative Service of Process on Norwegian Defendants filed by PRIME STEAKHOUSE, mooting 26 Motion to Stay filed by LEROY SEAFOOD USA INC, mooting 24 Motion to Extend Time filed by PRIME STEAKHOUSE, mooting #15 Order to Show Cause By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (CCS)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Reset Answer Deadline for Leroy Seafood USA Inc., Marine Harvest USA, LLC, Marine Harvest Canada, Inc., Ducktrap River of Maine LLC, Ocean Quality USA Inc., Ocean Quality Premium Brands, Inc., Grieg Seafood BC Ltd., Scottish Sea Farms Ltd, and Salmar ASA per General Order 2020-2 issued by Chief Judge Jon D. Levy on 3/18/2020: Answers due by 5/27/2020. (tcs)
March 11, 2020 Reset Answer Deadline for SALMAR ASA: Answer due by 4/27/2020. (tcs)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting without objection #66 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant SalMar shall respond to the plaintiff's complaint by April 27, 2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
March 10, 2020 Filing 66 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, until April 27, 2020 by SALMAR ASA Responses due by 3/31/2020. (STITHAM, STACY)
March 10, 2020 Filing 65 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by SALMAR ASA. (STITHAM, STACY)
March 10, 2020 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by STACY O. STITHAM on behalf of SALMAR ASA (STITHAM, STACY)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting #62 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Eckles' representation of defendants Marine Harvest USA, LLC and Ducktrap River of Maine, LLC is hereby terminated; those defendants continue to be represented by Attorneys Racine, Klotzle, and Lent. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
March 3, 2020 Filing 62 MOTION by Attorney Paul M. Eckles to Withdraw as Attorney by DUCKTRAP RIVER OF MAINE LLC, MARINE HARVEST USA LLC Responses due by 3/24/2020. (RACINE, KRISTIN)
March 3, 2020 Filing 61 NOTICE of Change of Address by KRISTIN MICHELLE RACINE (RACINE, KRISTIN)
February 25, 2020 Filing 60 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by SCOTTISH SEA FARMS LTD. (STITHAM, STACY)
February 21, 2020 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by BRADEN ALEXANDER BEARD on behalf of LEROY SEAFOOD USA INC (BEARD, BRADEN)
February 20, 2020 Filing 58 Response to Objection to Report and Recommended Decision re #55 Report and Recommended Decision,,,,,,,,, filed by DUCKTRAP RIVER OF MAINE LLC, GRIEG SEAFOOD BC LTD, LEROY SEAFOOD USA INC, MARINE HARVEST CANADA INC, MARINE HARVEST USA LLC, OCEAN QUALITY PREMIUM BRANDS INC, OCEAN QUALITY USA INC. (WEBBERT, DAVID)
February 20, 2020 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by KRISTIN MICHELLE RACINE on behalf of DUCKTRAP RIVER OF MAINE LLC, MARINE HARVEST CANADA INC, MARINE HARVEST USA LLC (RACINE, KRISTIN)
February 6, 2020 Filing 56 OBJECTION to #55 Report and Recommended Decision filed by PRIME STEAKHOUSE. Responses due by 2/20/2020. (FINLEY, ALEC) Modified on 2/7/2020 to clean up docket text(tcs).
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 RECOMMENDED DECISION ON MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE re #29 MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); 24 Motion to Extend Time; 26 Motion to Stay; #14 MOTION for Approval of Plan for Alternative Service of Process on Norwegian Defendants; and #15 Order to Show Cause By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (slg)
January 21, 2020 Reset Answer Deadline for Leroy Seafood USA Inc., Marine Harvest USA, LLC, Marine Harvest Canada, Inc., Ducktrap River of Maine LLC, Ocean Quality USA Inc., Ocean Quality Premium Brands, Inc., Grieg Seafood BC Ltd., and Scottish Sea Farms Ltd : Answers due by 4/27/2020. (tcs)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting without objection #53 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Leroy Seafood USA Inc., Marine Harvest USA, LLC, Marine Harvest Canada, Inc., Ducktrap River of Maine LLC, Ocean Quality USA Inc., Ocean Quality Premium Brands, Inc., Grieg Seafood BC Ltd., and Scottish Sea Farms Ltd. shall respond to the plaintiff's complaint by April 27, 2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
January 17, 2020 Filing 53 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer by DUCKTRAP RIVER OF MAINE LLC, GRIEG SEAFOOD BC LTD, LEROY SEAFOOD USA INC, MARINE HARVEST CANADA INC, MARINE HARVEST USA LLC, OCEAN QUALITY PREMIUM BRANDS INC, OCEAN QUALITY USA INC, SCOTTISH SEA FARMS LTD Responses due by 2/7/2020. (WEBBERT, DAVID)
December 23, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for SCOTTISH SEA FARMS LTD : Answer due by 1/27/2020. (tcs)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting without objection #51 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Scottish Sea Farms Ltd shall respond to the plaintiff's complaint by January 27, 2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
December 23, 2019 Filing 51 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, by SCOTTISH SEA FARMS LTD Responses due by 1/13/2020. (STITHAM, STACY)
December 23, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by STACY O. STITHAM on behalf of SCOTTISH SEA FARMS LTD (STITHAM, STACY)
November 26, 2019 Reset Answer Deadline for GRIEG SEAFOOD BC LTD, MARINE HARVEST CANADA INC : Answer due by 1/27/2020. (tcs)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting without objection #48 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Grieg Seafood BC Ltd. and Marine Harvest Canada, Inc. shall respond to the plaintiff's complaint by the earlier of January 27, 2020, or 60 days from the filing of a potential consolidated complaint. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
November 21, 2019 Filing 48 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, by GRIEG SEAFOOD BC LTD, MARINE HARVEST CANADA INC Responses due by 12/12/2019. (PARK, KASIA)
November 21, 2019 Filing 47 Motion(s) joined by DUCKTRAP RIVER OF MAINE LLC, GRIEG SEAFOOD BC LTD, MARINE HARVEST CANADA INC, MARINE HARVEST USA LLC : #29 MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by OCEAN QUALITY PREMIUM BRANDS INC, OCEAN QUALITY USA INC, LEROY SEAFOOD USA INC . (PARK, KASIA)
November 20, 2019 Filing 46 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by MARINE HARVEST CANADA INC. (KLOTZLE, REBECCA)
November 20, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by REBECCA G. KLOTZLE on behalf of MARINE HARVEST CANADA INC (KLOTZLE, REBECCA)
November 20, 2019 Filing 44 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by GRIEG SEAFOOD BC LTD. (PARK, KASIA)
November 20, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by KASIA S. PARK on behalf of GRIEG SEAFOOD BC LTD (PARK, KASIA)
October 28, 2019 Reset Answer Deadlines for Leroy Seafood USA Inc., Marine Harvest USA, LLC, Ducktrap River of Maine LLC, Ocean Quality USA Inc., and Ocean Quality Premium Brands, Inc: Answer due by the earlier of January 27, 2020, or 60 days from the filing of a potential consolidated complaint. (tcs)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting without objection #41 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Leroy Seafood USA Inc., Marine Harvest USA, LLC, Ducktrap River of Maine LLC, Ocean Quality USA Inc., and Ocean Quality Premium Brands, Inc. shall respond to the plaintiff's complaint by the earlier of January 27, 2020, or 60 days from the filing of a potential consolidated complaint. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
October 25, 2019 Filing 41 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer by DUCKTRAP RIVER OF MAINE LLC, LEROY SEAFOOD USA INC, MARINE HARVEST USA LLC, OCEAN QUALITY PREMIUM BRANDS INC, OCEAN QUALITY USA INC Responses due by 11/15/2019. (WEBBERT, DAVID)
October 15, 2019 Filing 40 REPLY to Response to Motion re #29 MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by LEROY SEAFOOD USA INC. (WEBBERT, DAVID)
October 1, 2019 Filing 39 RESPONSE in Opposition re #29 MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by PRIME STEAKHOUSE. Reply due by 10/15/2019. (FINLEY, ALEC)
September 27, 2019 Reset Answer Deadline for Leroy Seafood USA Inc., Marine Harvest USA, LLC, Ducktrap River of Maine LLC, Ocean Quality USA Inc., and Ocean Quality Premium Brands, Inc. Answer due by 10/28/2019. (tcs)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting without objection #37 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Leroy Seafood USA Inc., Marine Harvest USA, LLC, Ducktrap River of Maine LLC, Ocean Quality USA Inc., and Ocean Quality Premium Brands, Inc. shall respond to the plaintiff's complaint by October 28, 2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
September 26, 2019 Reset Deadlines : Attorney PAUL M. ECKLES shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 10/4/2019. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. (mnw)
September 24, 2019 Filing 37 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer until October 28, 2019 by LEROY SEAFOOD USA INC, OCEAN QUALITY PREMIUM BRANDS INC, OCEAN QUALITY USA INC Responses due by 10/15/2019. (WEBBERT, DAVID)
September 20, 2019 Set Deadlines : Attorney PAUL M. ECKLES and Attorney KAREN HOFFMAN LENT shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 9/27/2019. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. (tcs)
September 19, 2019 Filing 36 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Karen Hoffman Lent filed by REBECCA G. KLOTZLE on behalf of DUCKTRAP RIVER OF MAINE LLC, MARINE HARVEST USA LLC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2081346.) (KLOTZLE, REBECCA)
September 19, 2019 Filing 35 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Paul M. Eckles filed by REBECCA G. KLOTZLE on behalf of DUCKTRAP RIVER OF MAINE LLC, MARINE HARVEST USA LLC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2081344.) (KLOTZLE, REBECCA)
September 19, 2019 Filing 34 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by DUCKTRAP RIVER OF MAINE LLC, MARINE HARVEST USA LLC. (KLOTZLE, REBECCA)
September 19, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by REBECCA G. KLOTZLE on behalf of DUCKTRAP RIVER OF MAINE LLC, MARINE HARVEST USA LLC (KLOTZLE, REBECCA)
September 19, 2019 Filing 32 REPLY to Response to Motion re 26 MOTION to Stay of Further Consideration of Motion (ECF No. 14) for Approval of Plan for Alternative Service of Process on Norwegian Defendants filed by LEROY SEAFOOD USA INC. (WEBBERT, DAVID)
September 16, 2019 Filing 31 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION for Approval of Plan for Alternative Service of Process on Norwegian Defendants filed by PRIME STEAKHOUSE. (FINLEY, ALEC)
September 13, 2019 Reset Deadlines per conversation with Judge Rich and Counsel as to 26 MOTION to Stay : Reply due by 9/20/2019. (tcs)
September 11, 2019 Filing 30 RESPONSE to Motion re 26 MOTION to Stay Further Consideration of Motion (ECF No. 14) for Approval of Plan for Alternative Service of Process on Norwegian Defendants filed by PRIME STEAKHOUSE. Reply due by 9/25/2019. (FINLEY, ALEC)
September 10, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by LEROY SEAFOOD USA INC, OCEAN QUALITY PREMIUM BRANDS INC, OCEAN QUALITY USA INC Responses due by 10/1/2019. (WEBBERT, DAVID) Modified on 2/14/2020 to un-terminate motion per filing of R&R #55 (tcs).
September 9, 2019 Filing 28 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by OCEAN QUALITY PREMIUM BRANDS INC, OCEAN QUALITY USA INC. (PARK, KASIA)
September 9, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by KASIA S. PARK on behalf of OCEAN QUALITY PREMIUM BRANDS INC, OCEAN QUALITY USA INC (PARK, KASIA)
September 9, 2019 Reset Deadlines as directed by Judge Rich: Responses due by 9/11/2019 as to 26 MOTION to Stay. (tcs)
September 6, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION to Stay (no PDF attached, see PDF at ECF #25) by LEROY SEAFOOD USA INC Responses due by 9/20/2019. (tcs) Modified on 2/14/2020 to un-terminate motion per filing of R&R #55 (tcs).
September 6, 2019 Filing 25 RESPONSE to Motion re #14 MOTION for Approval of Plan for Alternative Service of Process on Norwegian Defendants. RESPONSE to Motion re 24 MOTION to Extend Time filed by LEROY SEAFOOD USA INC. Reply due by 9/20/2019. (WEBBERT, DAVID) Modified on 9/9/2019 to clean up docket text(tcs).
August 29, 2019 Set Deadlines as to 24 MOTION to Extend Time: Expedited Response due by 9/6/2019.
August 28, 2019 Reset Deadlines pursuant to Order at ECF #23 as to #14 MOTION for Approval of Plan for Alternative Service of Process on Norwegian Defendants : Responses due by 9/6/2019. (tcs)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting without objection #22 Motion to Extend Time. The United States Defendants shall respond to the plaintiff's motion for alternative service, ECF No. 14, by September 6, 2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
August 27, 2019 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time for Nine-Day Extension of Time for Defendants Leroy Seafood USA Inc., Marine Harvest USA, LLC, Ducktrap River of Maine LLC, Ocean Quality USA Inc., and Ocean Quality Premium Brands, Inc. to Respond to Plaintiffs Motion (ECF No. 14) by LEROY SEAFOOD USA INC Responses due by 9/17/2019. (WEBBERT, DAVID)
August 21, 2019 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by LEROY SEAFOOD USA INC. (WEBBERT, DAVID)
August 20, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Extend Time (no pdf attatched, see pdf at ECF #20) by PRIME STEAKHOUSE (tcs) Modified on 2/14/2020 to un-terminate motion per filing of R&R #55(tcs).
August 20, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE TO #15 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by PRIME STEAKHOUSE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(FINLEY, ALEC)
August 20, 2019 Filing 19 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal by PRIME STEAKHOUSE of Defendant Bremnes Seashore AS (FINLEY, ALEC)
August 20, 2019 Reset Answer Deadline Per Order at ECF #18: Answer as to defendants Leroy Seafood USA Inc., Marine Harvest USA, LLC, Ducktrap River of Maine LLC, OceanQuality USA Inc., and Ocean Quality Premium Brands, Inc. due by 9/27/2019. (tcs)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting without objection #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The United States Defendants shall respond to the plaintiff's complaint by September 27, 2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
August 19, 2019 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer Until September 27, 2019 by DUCKTRAP RIVER OF MAINE LLC, LEROY SEAFOOD USA INC, MARINE HARVEST USA LLC, OCEAN QUALITY PREMIUM BRANDS INC, OCEAN QUALITY USA INC Responses due by 9/9/2019. (WEBBERT, DAVID)
August 16, 2019 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement as to LEROY SEAFOOD USA INC due by 8/23/2019. (tcs)
August 16, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID G. WEBBERT on behalf of LEROY SEAFOOD USA INC (WEBBERT, DAVID)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 8/23/2019. By DEPUTY CLERK: Teagan Snyder (tcs) Modified on 2/14/2020 to un-terminate motion per filing of R&R #55(tcs).
August 7, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Approval of Plan for Alternative Service of Process on Norwegian Defendants by PRIME STEAKHOUSE Responses due by 8/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 to Declaration, #7 Exhibit 6 to Declaration, #8 Exhibit 7 to Declaration, #9 Exhibit 8 to Declaration, #10 Exhibit 9 to Declaration, #11 Exhibit 10 to Declaration, #12 Exhibit 11 to Declaration, #13 Exhibit 12 to Declaration, #14 Exhibit 13 to Declaration)(FINLEY, ALEC) Modified on 8/8/2019 to remove "incorporated memorandum of law" (tcs) Modified on 2/14/2020 to un-terminate motion per filing of R&R #55(tcs).
August 7, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for OCEAN QUALITY PREMIUM BRANDS INC : Answer due by 8/27/2019. (akr)
August 7, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service by PRIME STEAKHOUSE. OCEAN QUALITY PREMIUM BRANDS INC served on 8/6/2019. (FINLEY, ALEC)
August 6, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for LEROY SEAFOOD USA INC : Answer due by 8/22/2019. (tcs)
August 6, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for DUCKTRAP RIVER OF MAINE LLC : Answer due by 8/22/2019. (tcs)
August 6, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for MARINE HARVEST USA LLC : Answer due by 8/22/2019. (tcs)
August 6, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for OCEAN QUALITY USA INC : Answer due by 8/22/2019. (tcs)
August 6, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #10 Affidavit of Service, #11 Affidavit of Service : Docket entries were modified to correct Service of Process date from 8/2/2019 to 8/1/2019. (tcs)
August 5, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service by PRIME STEAKHOUSE. LEROY SEAFOOD USA INC served on 8/1/2019. (FINLEY, ALEC) Modified on 8/6/2019 to correct service of process date from 8/2/2019 to 8/1/2019 (tcs).
August 5, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service by PRIME STEAKHOUSE. DUCKTRAP RIVER OF MAINE LLC served on 8/1/2019. (FINLEY, ALEC) Modified on 8/6/2019 to correct service of process date from 8/2/2019 to 8/1/2019 (tcs).
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service by PRIME STEAKHOUSE. MARINE HARVEST USA LLC served on 8/1/2019. (FINLEY, ALEC)
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service by PRIME STEAKHOUSE. OCEAN QUALITY USA INC served on 8/1/2019. (FINLEY, ALEC)
July 19, 2019 Set Deadlines : Attorney DANIEL M COHEN, Attorney JONATHAN W CUNEO and Attorney ALEC BLAINE FINLEY, JR shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 7/26/2019. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. (tcs)
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jonathan W. Cuneo filed by TAYLOR ANDREW ASEN on behalf of PRIME STEAKHOUSE (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2051031.) (ASEN, TAYLOR)
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Daniel M. Cohen filed by TAYLOR ANDREW ASEN on behalf of PRIME STEAKHOUSE (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2051023.) (ASEN, TAYLOR)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Alec Blaine Finley, Jr. filed by TAYLOR ANDREW ASEN on behalf of PRIME STEAKHOUSE (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2051014.) (ASEN, TAYLOR) Modified on 7/19/2019 to add name of PHV attorney (slg).
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties by PRIME STEAKHOUSE (ASEN, TAYLOR)
May 14, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2019239.), filed by PRIME STEAKHOUSE.(ASEN, TAYLOR)
May 9, 2019 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 5/16/2019 from PRIME STEAKHOUSE. (sfw)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to BREMNES SEASHORE AS, DUCKTRAP RIVER OF MAINE LLC, GRIEG SEAFOOD ASA, GRIEG SEAFOOD BC LTD, LEROY SEAFOOD GROUP ASA, LEROY SEAFOOD USA INC, MARINE HARVEST CANADA INC, MARINE HARVEST USA LLC, MOWI ASA, OCEAN QUALITY AS, OCEAN QUALITY NORTH AMERICA INC, OCEAN QUALITY PREMIUM BRANDS INC, OCEAN QUALITY USA INC, SALMAR ASA, SCOTTISH SEA FARMS LTD. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Marine Harvest USA LLC, #2 Summons Issued as to Marine Harvest Canada Inc, #3 Summons Issued as to Ducktrap River of Maine LLC, #4 Summons Issued as to Grieg Seafood ASA, #5 Summons Issued as to Grieg Seafood BC LTD, #6 Summons Issued as to Bremnes Seashore AS, #7 Summons Issued as to Ocean Quality AS, #8 Summons Issued as to Ocean Quality North America Inc, #9 Summons Issued as to Ocean Quality USA Inc, #10 Summons Issued as to Ocean Quality Premium Brands Inc, #11 Summons Issued as to SALMAR ASA, #12 Summons Issued as to Leroy Seafood Group ASA, #13 Summons Issued as to Leroy Seafood USA Inc, #14 Summons Issued as to Scottish Sea Farms LTD)(sfw)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (sfw)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BREMNES SEASHORE AS, DUCKTRAP RIVER OF MAINE LLC, GRIEG SEAFOOD ASA, GRIEG SEAFOOD BC LTD, LEROY SEAFOOD GROUP ASA, LEROY SEAFOOD USA INC, MARINE HARVEST CANADA INC, MARINE HARVEST USA LLC, MOWI ASA, OCEAN QUALITY AS, OCEAN QUALITY NORTH AMERICA INC, OCEAN QUALITY PREMIUM BRANDS INC, OCEAN QUALITY USA INC, SALMAR ASA, SCOTTISH SEA FARMS LTD with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by PRIME STEAKHOUSE. (Service of Process Deadline 8/7/2019) Fee due by 5/13/2019.(sfw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PRIME STEAKHOUSE v. MOWI ASA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocean Quality Premium Brands, Inc.
Represented By: Kasia S. Park
Represented By: Sara Leann Salem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scottish Sea Farms Ltd.
Represented By: Stacy O. Stitham
Represented By: Adam Louis Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marine Harvest Canada Inc.
Represented By: Rebecca G. Klotzle
Represented By: Kristin Michelle Racine
Represented By: Lawrence Dean Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOWI ASA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SalMar ASA
Represented By: Stacy O. Stitham
Represented By: Adam Louis Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocean Quality North America Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bremnes Seashore AS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leroy Seafood Group ASA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grieg Seafood ASA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marine Harvest USA, LLC
Represented By: Rebecca G. Klotzle
Represented By: Karen Hoffman Lent
Represented By: Kristin Michelle Racine
Represented By: Paul M. Eckles
Represented By: Lawrence Dean Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grieg Seafood BC Ltd.
Represented By: Kasia S. Park
Represented By: Sara Leann Salem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocean Quality AS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocean Quality USA Inc.
Represented By: Kasia S. Park
Represented By: Sara Leann Salem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ducktrap River of Maine LLC
Represented By: Rebecca G. Klotzle
Represented By: Karen Hoffman Lent
Represented By: Kristin Michelle Racine
Represented By: Paul M. Eckles
Represented By: Lawrence Dean Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leroy Seafood USA Inc.
Represented By: David G. Webbert
Represented By: Braden Alexander Beard
Represented By: Christine L. Welstead
Represented By: John Carl Seipp, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prime Steakhouse
Represented By: Daniel M Cohen
Represented By: Taylor Andrew Asen
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Represented By: Alec Blaine Finley, Jr.
Represented By: Samuel Johnathan Dubbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?