Lacroix v. Lejeune Auto Wholesale,Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Garvens Lacroix
Defendant: A.O.G. Recovery & Investigation, Corp., Lejeune Auto Wholesale, Inc. and Overall Recovery, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv21469
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Edwin G Torres
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2020 Filing 11 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #6 Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM And Supporting Memorandum Of Law by Lejeune Auto Wholesale, Inc.. Responses due by 6/16/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-3)(Stiphany, Gary)
June 2, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Garvens Lacroix. Overall Recovery, Inc. waiver sent on 5/22/2020, answer due 7/21/2020. (Weisberg, Alexander)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to #6 Amended Complaint, for good cause shown in the unopposed motion:Defendant Lejeune Auto's Response/Answer now due 6/2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 5/14/2020. (EGT)
May 14, 2020 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #6 Amended Complaint by Lejeune Auto Wholesale, Inc.. Attorney Gary Thomas Stiphany added to party Lejeune Auto Wholesale, Inc.(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Stiphany, Gary)
May 13, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Overall Recovery, Inc.. (cqs)
May 13, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Lejeune Auto Wholesale, Inc., Overall Recovery, Inc., filed by Garvens Lacroix. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - RISC, #2 Summon(s))(Weisberg, Alexander)
May 1, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Garvens Lacroix. Lejeune Auto Wholesale, Inc. served on 4/24/2020, answer due 5/15/2020. (Weisberg, Alexander)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES; REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters and Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 4/7/2020. See attached document for full details. (jas)
April 7, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to A.O.G. Recovery & Investigation, Corp., Lejeune Auto Wholesale, Inc.. (cds)
April 6, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against A.O.G. Recovery & Investigation, Corp., Lejeune Auto Wholesale, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12705701, filed by Garvens Lacroix. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - RISC, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s))(Weisberg, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lacroix v. Lejeune Auto Wholesale,Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garvens Lacroix
Represented By: Alexander Daniel Weisberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.O.G. Recovery & Investigation, Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lejeune Auto Wholesale, Inc.
Represented By: Gary Thomas Stiphany
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Overall Recovery, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?