Lotero-Diaz v. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Plaintiff: Gloria Lotero-Diaz
Defendant: Jill A. Eggleston, Kurt G. Vicha and U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Case Number: 1:2020cv21487
Filed: April 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Federico A Moreno
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:0552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #15 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of June 3, 2020 Deadline to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Plaintff must respond to #14 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint as Moot no later than June 17, 2020. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 6/3/2020. (km02)
June 2, 2020 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #14 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint, by Gloria Lotero-Diaz. (Militello, Ross)
May 20, 2020 Filing 14 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint, by Jill A. Eggleston, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Kurt G. Vicha. Responses due by 6/3/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Eggleston Declaration, #2 Exhibit Ex to Eggleston Decl. (FOIA Response Letter dtd May 8), #3 Exhibit USCIS Letter Extending NOID deadline)(Raurell, Carlos)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #12 Defendants' Motion for 7-Day Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint and Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Defendants must, no later than May 20, 2020, answer or respond to #1 Plaintiff's Complaint for Injunctive, Declaratory, and Mandamus Relief. And Defendants must respond, no later than May 25, 2020, to #11 Plaintiff's Expedited Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/14/2020. (km02)
May 13, 2020 Filing 12 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, #11 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Jill A. Eggleston, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Kurt G. Vicha. Attorney Carlos Javier Raurell added to party Jill A. Eggleston(pty:dft), Attorney Carlos Javier Raurell added to party U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft), Attorney Carlos Javier Raurell added to party Kurt G. Vicha(pty:dft). (Raurell, Carlos)
May 3, 2020 Filing 11 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Gloria Lotero-Diaz. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J)(Militello, Ross)
April 21, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ana Maria I Candela on behalf of Gloria Lotero-Diaz. Attorney Ana Maria I Candela added to party Gloria Lotero-Diaz(pty:pla). (Candela, Ana)
April 14, 2020 Filing 9 Clerks Notice to Filer re #6 Summons Returned Executed as to USA,. Incorrect Service Date Entered; ERROR - The incorrect service date was entered. The correction was made by the Clerk and filing was re-docketed, see 7 8 . It is not necessary to refile this document. (cbr)
April 14, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed U.S. Attorney served on 4/11/2020, answer due 6/10/2020. see DE #6 for image (cbr)
April 14, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed U.S. Attorney General served on 4/13/2020, answer due 6/12/2020. see DE #6 for image (cbr)
April 14, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Gloria Lotero-Diaz. Jill A. Eggleston served on 4/10/2020, answer due 6/9/2020; U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 4/10/2020, answer due 6/9/2020; Kurt G. Vicha served on 4/10/2020, answer due 6/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Delivery USAO, #2 Proof of Delivery US AG, #3 Proof of Delivery Defendants)(Militello, Ross)
April 8, 2020 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has updated the primary email address for attorney Ross Anthony Militello re #4 Notice of Change of Address. (cw)
April 8, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Address by Ross Anthony Militello (Militello, Ross)
April 8, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Jill A. Eggleston, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Kurt G. Vicha, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (pcs)
April 8, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
April 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12712894, filed by Gloria Lotero-Diaz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) USCIS, #3 Summon(s) Eggleston, #4 Summon(s) Vicha, #5 Summon(s) US Attorney's Office, #6 Summon(s) US Attorney General)(Militello, Ross)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lotero-Diaz v. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill A. Eggleston
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Carlos Javier Raurell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kurt G. Vicha
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Carlos Javier Raurell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Carlos Javier Raurell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Lotero-Diaz
Represented By: Ross Anthony Militello
Represented By: Ana Maria I Candela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?