PORTLAND HUNT-ALPINE CLUB LLC v. MOWI ASA et al
Plaintiff: PORTLAND HUNT-ALPINE CLUB LLC
Defendant: Ocean Quality Premium Brands, Inc., Scottish Sea Farms Ltd., Marine Harvest Canada Inc., MOWI ASA, SalMar ASA, Ocean Quality North America Inc., Leroy Seafood Group ASA, Grieg Seafood BC Ltd., Grieg Seafood ASA, Marine Harvest USA, LLC, Ocean Quality AS, Ocean Quality USA Inc., Ducktrap River of Maine LLC and Leroy Seafood USA Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv21509
Filed: April 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodney Smith
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:0001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2020 Civil Case Terminated PER DE#74 . Closing Case. (cds)
April 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 4/18/2020. See attached document for full details. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-22128-RS, 1:20-cv-21509-RS. All subsequent filings shall be in and bear Case No. 19-22128-CIV-SMITH. (cds) Text Modified on 4/20/2020 (cds).
April 18, 2020 Cases associated. (cds)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #71 Motion for Substitution of Counsel. Lawrence D. Silverman of the law firm of Akerman LLP shall serve as counsel of record for Marine Harvest USA, LLC and Ducktrap River of Maine LLC. Kristin Michelle Racine and Rebecca Gray Klotzle of Curtis Thaxter, LLC are hereby TERMINATED as counsel of record for Defendants Marine Harvest USA, LLC and Ducktrap River of Maine, and shall have no further obligations in this matter. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 4/17/2020. (dco)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #70 Motion for Substitution of Counsel. Sara Salem of the law firm of Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer US LLP, shall serve as counsel of record for Defendants Ocean Quality USA, Inc., Ocean Quality Premium Brands, Inc., Ocean Quality North America, Inc., and Grieg Seafood BC Ltd. Kasia S. Park of Drummond Woodsum of the law firm of Drummond Woodsum is hereby TERMINATED as counsel of record for Ocean Quality USA, Inc., Ocean Quality Premium Brands, Inc., Ocean Quality North America, Inc., and Grieg Seafood BC Ltd., and shall have no further obligations in this matter. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 4/17/2020. (dco)
April 17, 2020 Filing 71 Unopposed STIPULATED MOTION for Substitution of Counsel. Substituting Lawrence D.Silverman for Kristin Michelle Racine and Rebecca Gray Klotzle of Curtis Thaxter, LLC by Ducktrap River of Maine LLC, Marine Harvest USA, LLC. Responses due by 5/1/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Substitution of Counsel)(Silverman, Lawrence)
April 17, 2020 Filing 70 Renewed STIPULATED MOTION for Substitution of Counsel. Substituting Sara Salem for Kasia S. Park by Grieg Seafood BC Ltd., Ocean Quality North America Inc., Ocean Quality Premium Brands, Inc., Ocean Quality USA Inc.. Responses due by 5/1/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Salem, Sara)
April 17, 2020 Filing 69 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lawrence Dean Silverman on behalf of Ducktrap River of Maine LLC, Marine Harvest USA, LLC. Attorney Lawrence Dean Silverman added to party Ducktrap River of Maine LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Lawrence Dean Silverman added to party Marine Harvest USA, LLC(pty:dft). (Silverman, Lawrence)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #66 Motion for Substitution of Counsel. Adam L. Schwartz of the law firm of Homer Bonner Jacobs Ortiz, P.A., shall serve as counsel of record for Defendant Scottish Sea Farms Ltd. Stacy O. Stitham of the law firm of Brann and Isaacson is hereby terminated as counsel of record for Scottish Sea Farms Ltd., and shall have no further obligations in this matter. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 4/16/2020. (dco)
April 16, 2020 Filing 67 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Carl Seipp, Jr on behalf of Leroy Seafood USA Inc.. Attorney John Carl Seipp, Jr added to party Leroy Seafood USA Inc.(pty:dft). (Seipp, John)
April 16, 2020 Filing 66 Renewed STIPULATED MOTION for Substitution of Counsel. Substituting Adam L. Schwartz for Stacy O. Stitham by Scottish Sea Farms Ltd.. Responses due by 4/30/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schwartz, Adam)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 PAPERLESS ORDER denying without prejudice #60 #64 Motions for Substitution of Counsel for failure to comply with Local Rule 7.1(a)(3). Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 4/15/2020. (dco)
April 15, 2020 Filing 64 UNSTIPULATED MOTION for Substitution of Counsel. Substituting Sara Salem for Kasia S. Park by Grieg Seafood BC Ltd., Ocean Quality North America Inc., Ocean Quality Premium Brands, Inc., Ocean Quality USA Inc.. Responses due by 4/29/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Salem, Sara)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Judge Rodney Smith for all further proceedings, accepted and signed on 04/14/2020. Judge Kathleen M. Williams no longer assigned to case Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 4/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds)
April 14, 2020 Filing 62 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sara Leann Salem on behalf of Grieg Seafood BC Ltd., Ocean Quality North America Inc., Ocean Quality Premium Brands, Inc., Ocean Quality USA Inc.. Attorney Sara Leann Salem added to party Grieg Seafood BC Ltd.(pty:dft), Attorney Sara Leann Salem added to party Ocean Quality North America Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Sara Leann Salem added to party Ocean Quality Premium Brands, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Sara Leann Salem added to party Ocean Quality USA Inc.(pty:dft). (Salem, Sara)
April 13, 2020 Filing 61 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Leroy Seafood USA Inc.. Attorney Christine L. Welstead added to party Leroy Seafood USA Inc.(pty:dft). (Welstead, Christine)
April 12, 2020 Filing 60 UNSTIPULATED MOTION for Substitution of Counsel. Substituting Adam L. Schwartz for Stacy O. Stitham by Scottish Sea Farms Ltd.. Responses due by 4/27/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schwartz, Adam)
April 12, 2020 Filing 59 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam Louis Schwartz on behalf of Scottish Sea Farms Ltd.. Attorney Adam Louis Schwartz added to party Scottish Sea Farms Ltd.(pty:dft). (Schwartz, Adam)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS MATTER is before the Court on a sua sponte review of the record. On or before April 13, 2020, the Parties shall notify the Court whether this action is related to Case No. 19-cv-22128-RS. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 4/10/2020. (jws)
April 10, 2020 Filing 57 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Samuel Johnathan Dubbin on behalf of PORTLAND HUNT-ALPINE CLUB LLC. Attorney Samuel Johnathan Dubbin added to party PORTLAND HUNT-ALPINE CLUB LLC(pty:pla). (Dubbin, Samuel)
April 9, 2020 Filing 56 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Rebecca G. Klotzle, Kristin Michelle Racine, Kasia S. Park, Braden Alexander Beard, David G. Webbert, Adam J. Zapala, Alec Blaine Finley, Jr, Daniel C. Hedlund, Michelle J. Looby, Taylor Andrew Asen, David McMullan, Jr, Stacy O. Stitham, mailing date 04/09/2020. (cco)
April 9, 2020 Filing 55 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jua)
April 9, 2020 Filing 54 Case transferred in from Maine; Case Number 2:19-cv-00446. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(jua).
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #52 Motion to Transfer Case to the Southern District of Florida By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (tcs)
April 8, 2020 Filing 52 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to the Southern District of Florida by LEROY SEAFOOD USA INC Responses due by 4/29/2020. (WEBBERT, DAVID)
March 30, 2020 Reset Deadlines Per Order at ECF No. 51 as to #21 MOTION to Appoint Counsel , #29 MOTION for Alternative Service of Process on the Foreign Defendants: Defendants' Objections due by 5/20/2020. (tcs)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER re #21 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by PORTLAND HUNT-ALPINE CLUB LLC, #29 MOTION for Alternative Service of Process on the Foreign Defendants filed by PORTLAND HUNT-ALPINE CLUB LLC, #33 MOTION to Stay for Further Consideration of Motion (ECF No. 29) for Approval of Plan for Alternative Service of Process on Norwegian Defendants, or, in the Alternative, Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to ECF No. 29 filed by OCEAN QUALITY PREMIUM BRANDS INC, MARINE HARVEST USA LLC, DUCKTRAP RIVER OF MAINE LLC, OCEAN QUALITY USA INC, LEROY SEAFOOD USA INC. On December 5, 2019, plaintiff Portland Hunt-Alpine Club LLC filed a motion to appoint interim lead class counsel, ECF No. 21, upon which the Court has not acted. On December 30, 2019, the plaintiff filed a motion for approval of a plan for alternative service of process on the foreign defendants, ECF No. 29, for which the Court set a response deadline of January 21, 2020. On January 21, the defendants, Mowi ASA, et al., filed a motion for stay or, in the alternative, for an extension of time to file a response, ECF No. 33, in light of the then-pending motion for alternative service and motion to transfer in a companion case, Prime Steakhouse v. Mowi ASA, et al., No. 2:19-cv-00207-JAW (ECF Nos. 14 & 25). The Court took the defendants' motion to stay, ECF No. 33, under advisement, effectively staying motion practice in this action until resolution of that motion, but, on February 4, 2020, the plaintiff filed a reply memorandum characterizing the defendants' motion to stay as a "non-opposition[al] response" and arguing that its motion for alternative service should be granted as unopposed, ECF No. 36. The plaintiff cannot have it both ways: the defendants' motion to stay cannot be both a response and a non-response. Rather, the Prime Steakhouse motions having now been resolved and that case transferred out of this District, the defendants' motion to stay, ECF No. 33, is MOOT, and the briefing schedule on the plaintiff's two outstanding motions is SET as follows: The defendants shall file their objections to the plaintiff's motion to appoint, ECF No. 21, and motion for alternative service, ECF No. 29, within 51 days, or by May 20, 2020 (Local Rule 7(b) provides for a 21-day objection period, but the Court recently extended by 30 days any deadline between the date of the order (March 18, 2020) and May 1, 2020. (General Order 2020-2.)), and the plaintiff shall file its reply memoranda within 14 days thereof. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Reset Answer Deadlines for Ocean Quality Premium Brands, Inc., Ocean Quality USA, Inc., Marine Harvest USA, LLC, Ducktrap River of Maine, LLC, Leroy Seafood USA, Inc., Scottish Sea Farms, Ltd, Ocean Quality North America, Inc., Marine Harvest Canada, Inc. and Grieg Seafood BC Ltd per General Order 2020-2 issued by Chief Judge Jon D. Levy on 3/18/2020: Answers due by 5/27/2020. (tcs)
March 6, 2020 Filing 50 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PORTLAND HUNT-ALPINE CLUB LLC. MARINE HARVEST CANADA INC served on 2/12/2020. (ZAPALA, ADAM)
March 6, 2020 Filing 49 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PORTLAND HUNT-ALPINE CLUB LLC. GRIEG SEAFOOD BC LTD served on 2/12/2020. (ZAPALA, ADAM)
February 25, 2020 Filing 48 REPLY to Response to Motion re #33 MOTION to Stay for Further Consideration of Motion (ECF No. 29) for Approval of Plan for Alternative Service of Process on Norwegian Defendants, or, in the Alternative, Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to ECF No. 29 filed by DUCKTRAP RIVER OF MAINE LLC, LEROY SEAFOOD USA INC, MARINE HARVEST USA LLC, OCEAN QUALITY PREMIUM BRANDS INC, OCEAN QUALITY USA INC. (WEBBERT, DAVID)
February 25, 2020 Filing 47 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by SCOTTISH SEA FARMS LTD. (STITHAM, STACY)
February 21, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by BRADEN ALEXANDER BEARD on behalf of LEROY SEAFOOD USA INC (BEARD, BRADEN)
February 20, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by KRISTIN MICHELLE RACINE on behalf of DUCKTRAP RIVER OF MAINE LLC, MARINE HARVEST CANADA INC, MARINE HARVEST USA LLC (RACINE, KRISTIN)
February 18, 2020 Reset Answer Deadline as to Defendants Ocean Quality North America, Inc., Marine Harvest Canada, Inc. and Grieg Seafood BC Ltd.: Answers due by 4/27/2020. (tcs)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting without objection #43 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Ocean Quality North America, Inc., Mowi Canada West, Inc. (f/k/a Marine Harvest Canada, Inc.) and Grieg Seafood BC Ltd. shall respond to the plaintiff's complaint by April 27, 2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
February 14, 2020 Filing 43 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer (Joint Motion) by GRIEG SEAFOOD BC LTD, MARINE HARVEST CANADA INC, OCEAN QUALITY NORTH AMERICA INC Responses due by 3/6/2020. (PARK, KASIA)
February 14, 2020 Filing 42 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by MARINE HARVEST CANADA INC. (KLOTZLE, REBECCA)
February 14, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by REBECCA G. KLOTZLE on behalf of MARINE HARVEST CANADA INC (KLOTZLE, REBECCA)
February 13, 2020 Filing 40 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by GRIEG SEAFOOD BC LTD. (PARK, KASIA)
February 13, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by KASIA S. PARK on behalf of GRIEG SEAFOOD BC LTD (PARK, KASIA)
February 12, 2020 Set Answer Deadline for OCEAN QUALITY NORTH AMERICA INC : Answer due by 2/20/2020. (tcs)
February 11, 2020 Filing 38 RESPONSE to Motion re #33 MOTION to Stay for Further Consideration of Motion (ECF No. 29) for Approval of Plan for Alternative Service of Process on Norwegian Defendants, or, in the Alternative, Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to ECF No. 29 filed by PORTLAND HUNT-ALPINE CLUB LLC. Reply due by 2/25/2020. (ZAPALA, ADAM)
February 11, 2020 Filing 37 SUMMONS returned Executed by PORTLAND HUNT-ALPINE CLUB LLC. OCEAN QUALITY NORTH AMERICA INC served on 1/30/2020 (ZAPALA, ADAM) Modified on 2/12/2020 to clean up docket text (tcs).
February 4, 2020 Filing 36 REPLY to Response to Motion re #29 MOTION for Alternative Service of Process on the Foreign Defendants filed by PORTLAND HUNT-ALPINE CLUB LLC. (ZAPALA, ADAM)
February 4, 2020 Filing 35 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by OCEAN QUALITY NORTH AMERICA INC. (PARK, KASIA)
February 4, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by KASIA S. PARK on behalf of OCEAN QUALITY NORTH AMERICA INC (PARK, KASIA)
January 21, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION to Stay for Further Consideration of Motion (ECF No. 29) for Approval of Plan for Alternative Service of Process on Norwegian Defendants, or, in the Alternative, Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to ECF No. 29 by DUCKTRAP RIVER OF MAINE LLC, LEROY SEAFOOD USA INC, MARINE HARVEST USA LLC, OCEAN QUALITY PREMIUM BRANDS INC, OCEAN QUALITY USA INC Responses due by 2/11/2020. (WEBBERT, DAVID)
January 21, 2020 Reset Answer Deadlines for Ocean Quality Premium Brands, Inc., Ocean Quality USA, Inc., Marine Harvest USA, LLC, Ducktrap River of Maine, LLC, Leroy Seafood USA, Inc., and Scottish Sea Farms, Ltd. : Answer due by 4/27/2020. (tcs)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting without objection #31 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Ocean Quality Premium Brands, Inc., Ocean Quality USA, Inc., Marine Harvest USA, LLC, Ducktrap River of Maine, LLC, Leroy Seafood USA, Inc., and Scottish Sea Farms, Ltd.'s deadline to respond to the Complaint is extended to April 27, 2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
January 17, 2020 Filing 31 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer by DUCKTRAP RIVER OF MAINE LLC, LEROY SEAFOOD USA INC, MARINE HARVEST USA LLC, OCEAN QUALITY PREMIUM BRANDS INC, OCEAN QUALITY USA INC, SCOTTISH SEA FARMS LTD Responses due by 2/7/2020. (WEBBERT, DAVID)
January 17, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by STACY O. STITHAM on behalf of SCOTTISH SEA FARMS LTD (STITHAM, STACY)
December 30, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION for Alternative Service of Process on the Foreign Defendants by PORTLAND HUNT-ALPINE CLUB LLC Responses due by 1/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam Zapala, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13)(ZAPALA, ADAM) Modified on 12/31/2019 to clean-up docket text (jwr).
December 27, 2019 Filing 28 Summons Issued as to MOWI ASA. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa)
December 9, 2019 Reset Answer Deadline for Ocean Quality Premium Brands, Inc., Ocean Quality USA, Inc., Marine Harvest USA, LLC, Ducktrap River of Maine, LLC, and Leroy Seafood USA, Inc. Per Order at ECF #27: Answer due by 1/27/2020. (tcs)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting without objection #26 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Ocean Quality Premium Brands, Inc., Ocean Quality USA, Inc., Marine Harvest USA, LLC, Ducktrap River of Maine, LLC, and Leroy Seafood USA, Inc.'s deadline to respond to the Complaint is extended to January 27, 2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
December 6, 2019 Filing 26 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, by DUCKTRAP RIVER OF MAINE LLC, LEROY SEAFOOD USA INC, MARINE HARVEST USA LLC, OCEAN QUALITY PREMIUM BRANDS INC, OCEAN QUALITY USA INC Responses due by 12/27/2019. (PARK, KASIA)
December 6, 2019 Filing 25 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by LEROY SEAFOOD USA INC. (WEBBERT, DAVID)
December 6, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID G. WEBBERT on behalf of LEROY SEAFOOD USA INC (WEBBERT, DAVID)
December 6, 2019 Filing 23 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by OCEAN QUALITY USA INC. (PARK, KASIA)
December 6, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by KASIA S. PARK on behalf of OCEAN QUALITY USA INC (PARK, KASIA)
December 6, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for DUCKTRAP RIVER OF MAINE LLC, LEROY SEAFOOD USA INC, MARINE HARVEST USA LLC, OCEAN QUALITY PREMIUM BRANDS INC, OCEAN QUALITY USA INC : Answer due by 12/9/2019. (tcs)
December 5, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by PORTLAND HUNT-ALPINE CLUB LLC Responses due by 12/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Adam Zapala, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Adam Zapala, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Jonathan Cuneo, #4 Exhibit A to Declaration of Jonathan Cuneo, #5 Affidavit Declaration of Daniel Hedlund, #6 Exhibit A to Declaration of Daniel Hedlund, #7 Affidavit of John (Don) Barrett, #8 Affidavit Declaration of Shawn Raiter)(ZAPALA, ADAM)
December 5, 2019 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT of Service by PORTLAND HUNT-ALPINE CLUB LLC. OCEAN QUALITY USA INC served on 11/18/2019. (FINLEY, ALEC)
December 5, 2019 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Service by PORTLAND HUNT-ALPINE CLUB LLC. OCEAN QUALITY PREMIUM BRANDS INC served on 11/18/2019. (FINLEY, ALEC)
December 5, 2019 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service by PORTLAND HUNT-ALPINE CLUB LLC. MARINE HARVEST USA LLC served on 11/18/2019. (FINLEY, ALEC)
December 5, 2019 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service by PORTLAND HUNT-ALPINE CLUB LLC. LEROY SEAFOOD USA INC served on 11/18/2019. (FINLEY, ALEC)
December 5, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service by PORTLAND HUNT-ALPINE CLUB LLC. DUCKTRAP RIVER OF MAINE LLC served on 11/18/2019. (FINLEY, ALEC)
December 5, 2019 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by DUCKTRAP RIVER OF MAINE LLC, MARINE HARVEST USA LLC. (KLOTZLE, REBECCA)
December 5, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by REBECCA G. KLOTZLE on behalf of DUCKTRAP RIVER OF MAINE LLC, MARINE HARVEST USA LLC (KLOTZLE, REBECCA)
November 26, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by OCEAN QUALITY PREMIUM BRANDS INC. (PARK, KASIA)
November 26, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by KASIA S. PARK on behalf of OCEAN QUALITY PREMIUM BRANDS INC (PARK, KASIA)
October 28, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Alec Blaine Finley, Jr. filed by TAYLOR ANDREW ASEN on behalf of PORTLAND HUNT-ALPINE CLUB LLC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2099964.) (ASEN, TAYLOR)
October 16, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David McMullan, Jr. filed by DAVID MCMULLAN, JR on behalf of PORTLAND HUNT-ALPINE CLUB LLC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2093961.) (MCMULLAN, DAVID)
October 16, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michelle J. Looby filed by TAYLOR ANDREW ASEN on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2093950.) (ASEN, TAYLOR)
October 16, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Daniel C. Hedlund filed by TAYLOR ANDREW ASEN on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2093938.) (ASEN, TAYLOR)
October 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #6 Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Entry marked as filed in error. At request of the Clerk's Office, counsel to refile to correct date signed and file as an electronically converted PDF. (tcs)
October 15, 2019 Filing 6 **FILED IN ERROR** CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David McMullan, Jr. filed by DAVID MCMULLAN, JR on behalf of PORTLAND HUNT-ALPINE CLUB LLC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2093293.) (MCMULLAN, DAVID) Modified on 10/15/2019 to mark as filed in error(tcs). $100 Refunded on 10/16/2019 pay.gov Tracking ID: 26KT54P0 (mlm).
October 10, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Adam J. Zapala filed by ADAM J. ZAPALA on behalf of PORTLAND HUNT-ALPINE CLUB LLC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2092158.) (ZAPALA, ADAM)
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties by PORTLAND HUNT-ALPINE CLUB LLC (ASEN, TAYLOR)
October 1, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2086911.), filed by PORTLAND HUNT-ALPINE CLUB LLC.(ASEN, TAYLOR)
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to DUCKTRAP RIVER OF MAINE LLC, GRIEG SEAFOOD ASA, GRIEG SEAFOOD BC LTD, LEROY SEAFOOD GROUP ASA, LEROY SEAFOOD USA INC, MARINE HARVEST CANADA INC, MARINE HARVEST USA LLC, MOWI ASA, OCEAN QUALITY AS, OCEAN QUALITY NORTH AMERICA INC, OCEAN QUALITY PREMIUM BRANDS INC, OCEAN QUALITY USA INC, SALMAR ASA, SCOTTISH SEA FARMS LTD. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Grieg Seafood BC Ltd summons, #2 Leroy Seafood Group ASA summons, #3 Leroy Seafood USA Inc summons, #4 Marine Harvest Canada, Inc summons, #5 Ocean Quality AS summons, #6 Ocean Quality North America Inc summons, #7 SalMar ASA summons, #8 Scottish Sea Farms Ltd summons, #9 Ducktrap River of Maine LLC summons, #10 Marine Harvest USA, LLC summons, #11 Leroy Seafood USA Inc summons, #12 Ocean Quality Premium Brands, Inc summons, #13 Ocean Quality USA Inc summons)(bfa)
October 1, 2019 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 10/8/2019. (bfa)
October 1, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
October 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DUCKTRAP RIVER OF MAINE LLC, GRIEG SEAFOOD ASA, GRIEG SEAFOOD BC LTD, LEROY SEAFOOD GROUP ASA, LEROY SEAFOOD USA INC, MARINE HARVEST CANADA INC, MARINE HARVEST USA LLC, MOWI ASA, OCEAN QUALITY AS, OCEAN QUALITY NORTH AMERICA INC, OCEAN QUALITY PREMIUM BRANDS INC, OCEAN QUALITY USA INC, SALMAR ASA, SCOTTISH SEA FARMS LTD with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by PORTLAND HUNT-ALPINE CLUB LLC. (Service of Process Deadline 12/30/2019) Fee due by 10/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Review of Financial Reporting Grieg Seafood ASA, #2 Exhibit B - Official Joumal of the European Communities)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PORTLAND HUNT-ALPINE CLUB LLC v. MOWI ASA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocean Quality Premium Brands, Inc.
Represented By: Kasia S. Park
Represented By: Sara Leann Salem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scottish Sea Farms Ltd.
Represented By: Stacy O. Stitham
Represented By: Adam Louis Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marine Harvest Canada Inc.
Represented By: Rebecca G. Klotzle
Represented By: Kristin Michelle Racine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOWI ASA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SalMar ASA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocean Quality North America Inc.
Represented By: Kasia S. Park
Represented By: Sara Leann Salem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leroy Seafood Group ASA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grieg Seafood BC Ltd.
Represented By: Kasia S. Park
Represented By: Sara Leann Salem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grieg Seafood ASA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marine Harvest USA, LLC
Represented By: Rebecca G. Klotzle
Represented By: Kristin Michelle Racine
Represented By: Lawrence Dean Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocean Quality AS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocean Quality USA Inc.
Represented By: Kasia S. Park
Represented By: Sara Leann Salem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ducktrap River of Maine LLC
Represented By: Rebecca G. Klotzle
Represented By: Kristin Michelle Racine
Represented By: Lawrence Dean Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leroy Seafood USA Inc.
Represented By: David G. Webbert
Represented By: Braden Alexander Beard
Represented By: Christine L. Welstead
Represented By: John Carl Seipp, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PORTLAND HUNT-ALPINE CLUB LLC
Represented By: David McMullan, Jr.
Represented By: Taylor Andrew Asen
Represented By: Adam J. Zapala
Represented By: Michelle J. Looby
Represented By: Daniel C. Hedlund
Represented By: Alec Blaine Finley, Jr.
Represented By: Samuel Johnathan Dubbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?