Lopez v. Volusion, LLC
Plaintiff: Julio Lopez
Defendant: Volusion, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv21727
Filed: April 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Federico A Moreno
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND ORDER DENYING ALL PENDING MOTIONS AS MOOT. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 7/17/2020. See attached document for full details. (km02)
July 16, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Julio Lopez (Streisfeld, Jonathan)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #13 Joint Motion for Extensions of Time Regarding Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff must, no later than July 16, 2020, file its Response in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Defendant must file its Reply in support of its Motion to Dismiss no later than July 30, 2020. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 7/2/2020. (km02)
July 1, 2020 Filing 13 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint and Failure to State a Claim by Julio Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Streisfeld, Jonathan)
June 18, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint and Failure to State a Claim by Volusion, LLC. Responses due by 7/2/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Signed Declaration of Lance Wright, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order)(Fischman, Jenna)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant must answer or respond to the Complaint no later than June 19, 2020. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/18/2020. (km02)
May 15, 2020 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by Volusion, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Fischman, Jenna)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 #8 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorneys Hassan A. Zavareei and Mark A. Clifford of the law firm Tycko & Zavareei, LLP. Attorneys Hassan A. Zavareei and Mark A. Clifford are admitted pro hac vice to practice before this Court in the above-styled case. The Clerk of the Court shall provide electronic notice of all filings on this docket to Hassan A. Zavareei at hzavareei@tzlegal.com; and Mark A. Clifford at mclifford@tzlegal.com. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/12/2020. (km02)
May 11, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Mark A. Clifford. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-12869220 by Julio Lopez. Responses due by 5/26/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ostrow, Jeffrey)
May 11, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Hassan A. Zavareei. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-12869148 by Julio Lopez. Responses due by 5/26/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ostrow, Jeffrey)
May 11, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jenna Leigh Fischman on behalf of Volusion, LLC. Attorney Jenna Leigh Fischman added to party Volusion, LLC(pty:dft). (Fischman, Jenna)
April 30, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Julio Lopez. Volusion, LLC served on 4/29/2020, answer due 5/20/2020. (Ostrow, Jeffrey)
April 27, 2020 Filing 4 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Hassan A Zavareei, Mark A. Clifford, Melissa S. Weiner and Joseph C. Bourne, mailing date April 27, 2020, (pt)
April 27, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Volusion, LLC. (mee)
April 24, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee)
April 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Volusion, LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12794056, filed by Julio Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Summon(s), #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ostrow, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. Volusion, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julio Lopez
Represented By: Jeffrey Miles Ostrow
Represented By: Melissa S. Weiner
Represented By: Joseph C. Bourne
Represented By: Hassan A. Zavareei
Represented By: Jonathan Marc Streisfeld
Represented By: Mark A. Clifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volusion, LLC
Represented By: Jenna Leigh Fischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?