Serra v. Federal Express Corp.
Plaintiff: Orlando Serra
Defendant: Federal Express Corp.
Case Number: 1:2020cv21804
Filed: April 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:0621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 6/2/2020. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Robyn Hankins, Esq.; Mediation Hearing set for 7/7/2020 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/20/2020. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
May 19, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE by Orlando Serra of Mediation Conference (Bujan, Daniel)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Nathaly Saavedra withdrawn from case. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/15/2020. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
May 15, 2020 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Nathaly Saavedra, Esq for / by Orlando Serra. Responses due by 5/29/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Saavedra, Nathaly)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Setting Trial and Pretrial Schedule, Requiring Mediation, and Referring Certain Matters to Magistrate Judge: Trial set for two week period beginning 3/15/2021 in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Calendar Call set for 3/9/2021 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Proposed order scheduling mediation, in Word format via email, due by 6/4/20; Mediation Deadline 11/23/2020. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (ps1) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
May 14, 2020 Filing 12 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Orlando Serra (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Saavedra, Nathaly)
May 14, 2020 Filing 11 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Orlando Serra (Saavedra, Nathaly)
May 14, 2020 Filing 10 STATUS REPORT [REMOVING PARTY] by Federal Express Corp. (Wiggins, Allison)
May 7, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal by Federal Express Corp.. (Wiggins, Allison)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Frederick L. Douglas. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/6/2020. See attached document for full details. (wc)
May 5, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Frederick L. Douglas. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-12845019 by Federal Express Corp.. Responses due by 5/19/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiggins, Allison)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties to be filed by 5/14/2020. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/1/2020. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
May 1, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Court Practice in Removal Cases; Removal Status Report due by 5/14/2020. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/1/2020. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
May 1, 2020 Filing 4 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Frederick L. Douglas and Brian Coleman, mailing date May 1, 2020, (pt)
May 1, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Federal Express Corp. (Wiggins, Allison)
April 30, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (drz)
April 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Orlando Serra v Federal Express Corp.) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12821657, filed by Federal Express Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A to notice of removal, #3 Exhibit B to notice of removal, #4 Docket Sheet state court docket, #5 state court complaint)(Wiggins, Allison)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Serra v. Federal Express Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orlando Serra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Express Corp.
Represented By: Allison Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?