FREE AND SOVEREIGN STATE OF VERACRUS DE IGNACIO DE LA LLAVE v. ACE REALTY HOLDINGS, LLC et al
Plaintiff: FREE AND SOVEREIGN STATE OF VERACRUS DE IGNACIO DE LA LLAVE
Defendant: ACE REALTY HOLDINGS, LLC, VULCAN DYNAMIC REALTY FUND, LP, NEXXOS REALTY, LLC, Javier Duarte, Inaki Negrete and Ana Maria Velasquez
Case Number: 1:2020cv21884
Filed: May 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Defendant has failed to respond to #13 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court. Defendant shall show cause by filing a response to the motion, especially in light of Defendant's rather clear admission that it is in fact a resident of Florida for diversity purposes. Pursuant to Local Rule 7.1, failure to comply shall result in the motion being granted by default. Show Cause Response due by 7/8/2020. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 7/2/2020. (kml)
June 22, 2020 Filing 14 Plaintiff's RESPONSE to #13 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court , #4 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), , #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), #11 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #4 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by FREE AND SOVEREIGN STATE OF VERACRUS DE IGNACIO DE LA LLAVE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cusack, James)
June 4, 2020 Filing 13 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court by FREE AND SOVEREIGN STATE OF VERACRUS DE IGNACIO DE LA LLAVE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Cusack, James)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part and denying in part #11 Plaintiff's Amended Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff shall file a response on or before June 22, 2020, regardless of whether a determination has been made on Plaintiff's potential motion to remand. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 5/28/2020. (kml)
May 27, 2020 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #4 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by FREE AND SOVEREIGN STATE OF VERACRUS DE IGNACIO DE LA LLAVE. Responses due by 6/10/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cusack, James)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER denying without prejudice #9 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Should Plaintiff request additional time to file a response, it may re-file a motion with the proposed date. Otherwise, the Court will not delay the proceedings given the pendency of a yet-to-be-filed motion to remand. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 5/26/2020. (kml)
May 26, 2020 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #4 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by FREE AND SOVEREIGN STATE OF VERACRUS DE IGNACIO DE LA LLAVE. (Cusack, James)
May 26, 2020 Filing 8 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by FREE AND SOVEREIGN STATE OF VERACRUS DE IGNACIO DE LA LLAVE (Cusack, James)
May 21, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Christopher J. Leavitt. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-12919430 by FREE AND SOVEREIGN STATE OF VERACRUS DE IGNACIO DE LA LLAVE. Responses due by 6/4/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cusack, James)
May 21, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Anthony G. Buzbee. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-12919101 by FREE AND SOVEREIGN STATE OF VERACRUS DE IGNACIO DE LA LLAVE. Responses due by 6/4/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cusack, James)
May 19, 2020 Filing 5 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by VULCAN DYNAMIC REALTY FUND, LP (German, John)
May 15, 2020 Filing 4 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by VULCAN DYNAMIC REALTY FUND, LP. Responses due by 5/29/2020 (German, John)
May 6, 2020 Filing 3 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Raul E. Salas, Anthony G. Buzbee and Christopher J. Leavitt, mailing date May 6, 2020, (pt)
May 5, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (drz)
May 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12844609, filed by VULCAN DYNAMIC REALTY FUND, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part 1 - State Court filings, #2 Exhibit Part 2 - State Court filings, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(German, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FREE AND SOVEREIGN STATE OF VERACRUS DE IGNACIO DE LA LLAVE v. ACE REALTY HOLDINGS, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACE REALTY HOLDINGS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VULCAN DYNAMIC REALTY FUND, LP
Represented By: John Cody German
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEXXOS REALTY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Javier Duarte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inaki Negrete
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ana Maria Velasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FREE AND SOVEREIGN STATE OF VERACRUS DE IGNACIO DE LA LLAVE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?