Momenpour v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Farzie Momenpour
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2020cv21910
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:0405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed US Attorney served on 6/15/2020, answer due 8/14/2020. (jbs) Modified text on 6/17/2020 (jbs).
May 20, 2020 Filing 8 Clerks Notice of Magistrate Judge Assignment to Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan. Pursuant to the Clerks directive of this cause, this matter is referred for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (mr1)
May 13, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (lk)
May 12, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Farzie Momenpour re #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, (Berger, Erik)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Granting to the extent that the plaintiff need not prepay even a partial filing fee in this case, or to prepay costs such as for service of process. USM Service Ordered and Summonses NOT provided for USM Service. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 5/7/2020. See attached document for full details. (tro)
May 6, 2020 Filing 4 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan. (jbs)
May 6, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Farzie Momenpour. (jbs)
May 6, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pursuant to the Clerks directive of this cause, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jbs)
May 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security. Filing fees $ 400.00. IFP Filed, filed by Farzie Momenpour. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 In Forma Pauperis)Case restricted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2. (Berger, Erik)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Momenpour v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farzie Momenpour
Represented By: Erik William Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?