Maglana v. Celebrity Cruises Inc
Plaintiff: Mr. RYAN MAUNES MAGLANA, Francis Karl Bugayong and Ryan Maunes Maglana
Defendant: Celebrity Cruises Inc and Celebrity Cruises Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv22133
Filed: May 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jose E Martinez
Referring Judge: Alicia M Otazo-Reyes
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss #19 Amended Complaint , MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Celebrity Cruises Inc.. Responses due by 7/20/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Maglana's SOEA, #2 Exhibit B- Collective Bargaining Agreement, #3 Exhibit C- Maglana's POEA Contract, #4 Exhibit D- POEA Memorandum Circular No. 10, #5 Exhibit E- Bugayong's SOEA, #6 Exhibit F- Bugayong's POEA Contract, #7 Exhibit G- Declaration of Leah Martinez, #8 Exhibit H- The Convention)(Gutierrez, Annalisa)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #24 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages. Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law may exceed the page limit by five pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 6/29/2020. (gzu)
June 29, 2020 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for their Memorandum of law in support of their Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Francis Karl Bugayong, Ryan Maunes Maglana. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Delgado, Raul)
June 29, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by Francis Karl Bugayong, Ryan Maunes Maglana re #6 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to ORDER CELEBRITY to repatriate Plaintiff MAGLANA and all similarly situated Filipino crewmembers on Celebrity's ships held against their will, filed by Ryan Maunes Maglana, #7 Corrected MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to ORDER CELEBRITY to repatriate Plaintiff MAGLANA and all similarly situated Filipino crewmembers on Celebrity's ships held against their will, filed by Ryan Maunes Maglana in light of Amended Complaint and forthcoming Amended Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Delgado, Raul)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #13 Motion to Dismiss in light of Amended Complaint (ECF No. #19 ). Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 6/26/2020. (mws)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PAPERLESS ORDER REFERRING #7 Corrected MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to ORDER CELEBRITY to repatriate Plaintiff MAGLANA and all similarly situated Filipino crewmembers on Celebrity's ships held against their will, filed by Ryan Maunes Maglana. Motions referred to Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 6/26/2020. (mws)
June 26, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE Regarding The New Plaintiff And The Pending Motion For A Preliminary Injunction by Celebrity Cruises Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Ponce, Scott)
June 21, 2020 Filing 19 Plaintiff's AMENDED COMPLAINT pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15 (a)(1)(B) against Celebrity Cruises Inc, filed by Ryan Maunes Maglana, Francis Karl Bugayong.(Delgado, Raul)
June 9, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition to #7 Corrected MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to ORDER CELEBRITY to repatriate Plaintiff MAGLANA and all similarly situated Filipino crewmembers on Celebrity's ships held against their will, filed by Celebrity Cruises Inc. Replies due by 6/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Ponce, Scott)
June 9, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE by RYAN MAUNES MAGLANA Certificate of Interested Parties pursuant to FRCP 7.1 (Delgado, Raul)
June 9, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Compliance & Executed Response in Opposition to Defendant's Suggestion of Mootness by RYAN MAUNES MAGLANA re #15 Notice of Compliance, filed by RYAN MAUNES MAGLANA, 12 Order, #10 Notice (Other) filed by Celebrity Cruises Inc (Delgado, Raul)
June 9, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Compliance with D.E. 12 & their Response in Opposition to Defendant's Suggestion of Mootness by RYAN MAUNES MAGLANA re 12 Order, #10 Notice (Other) filed by Celebrity Cruises Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit P's ticket issued 5.23.20, #2 Exhibit CDC log of Crew Repatriations & Disembarkations, #3 Exhibit May 7 RCL repatriation slides) (Delgado, Raul)
June 8, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RYAN MAUNES MAGLANA. Celebrity Cruises Inc waiver sent on 5/23/2020, answer due 7/22/2020. (Delgado, Raul)
June 8, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint RE: Seaman,, and to Compel Arbitration by Celebrity Cruises Inc. Attorney Annalisa Gutierrez added to party Celebrity Cruises Inc(pty:dft). Responses due by 6/22/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Sign On Employment Agreement, #2 Exhibit B- CBA, #3 Exhibit C- POEA Signed Contract, #4 Exhibit D- POEA Memorandum, #5 Exhibit E- Declaration of Leah Martinez)(Gutierrez, Annalisa)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER. Plaintiff shall respond to ECF No. #10 no later than June 10, 2020. Failure to timely respond will result in dismissal without prejudice without further notice. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 6/5/2020. (mws)
June 3, 2020 Filing 11 CLERKS NOTICE ON SEAMAN'S CASE Directing Payment of $400.00 Filing Fees upon termination of case. (vjk)
May 27, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by Celebrity Cruises Inc Of Suggestion Of Mootness As To Plaintiff's Motion For Temporary Injunction (Ponce, Scott)
May 27, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jerry Dean Hamilton on behalf of Celebrity Cruises Inc. Attorney Jerry Dean Hamilton added to party Celebrity Cruises Inc(pty:dft). (Hamilton, Jerry)
May 27, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott Daniel Ponce on behalf of Celebrity Cruises Inc. Attorney Scott Daniel Ponce added to party Celebrity Cruises Inc(pty:dft). (Ponce, Scott)
May 26, 2020 Filing 7 Corrected MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to ORDER CELEBRITY to repatriate Plaintiff MAGLANA and all similarly situated Filipino crewmembers on Celebrity's ships held against their will, by RYAN MAUNES MAGLANA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cruise ship crewmember repatriation guidelines issued by CDC on April 23, 2020, #2 Text of Proposed Order Plaintiff's proposed findings of fact & conclusions of law)(Delgado, Raul)
May 26, 2020 Filing 6 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to ORDER CELEBRITY to repatriate Plaintiff MAGLANA and all similarly situated Filipino crewmembers on Celebrity's ships held against their will, by RYAN MAUNES MAGLANA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CDC Directive to Cruise Industry of April 23, 2020, #2 Text of Proposed Order Plain tiff's proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law)(Delgado, Raul)
May 22, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address by Raul Gabriel Delgado, II (Delgado, Raul)
May 22, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by RYAN MAUNES MAGLANA re #1 Complaint RE: Seaman,, Endorsement of counsel & Verification page (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Endorsed Complaint, #2 Supplement Plaintiff's verification of his Complaint) (Delgado, Raul)
May 22, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Celebrity Cruises Inc. (ebz)
May 21, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz)
May 21, 2020 Filing 1 Plaintiff's Complaint RE: Seaman & on behalf of all Filipino Seafarers held Captive onboard Celebrity's ships, as a CLASS ACTION against Celebrity Cruises Inc. CLERKS NOTICE: Please be advised that this Seamans Action filed pursuant to 28 USC 1916 defers prepayment of the filing fee until the termination of the case, filed by RYAN MAUNES MAGLANA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit "A" U.S. Coast Guard Circular directing U.S. flagged vessels to incorporate MLC & Repatriation Requirements, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summon(s))(Delgado, Raul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maglana v. Celebrity Cruises Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celebrity Cruises Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celebrity Cruises Inc.
Represented By: Scott Daniel Ponce
Represented By: Annalisa Gutierrez
Represented By: Jerry Dean Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. RYAN MAUNES MAGLANA
Represented By: Raul Gabriel Delgado, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis Karl Bugayong
Represented By: Raul Gabriel Delgado, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Maunes Maglana
Represented By: Raul Gabriel Delgado, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?