Metcoff v. Celebrity Cruises Inc
Plaintiff: Linda Metcoff
Defendant: Celebrity Cruises Inc
Case Number: 1:2020cv22236
Filed: May 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties due by 9/21/2020. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 7/9/2020. See attached document for full details. (wc)
July 9, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Linda Metcoff. (Black, Stefanie)
July 9, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Linda Metcoff. Celebrity Cruises Inc waiver sent on 7/8/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. (Black, Stefanie)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER requiring service to be perfected by 8/27/2020. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/23/2020. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
May 29, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Celebrity Cruises Inc. (scn)
May 29, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (scn)
May 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Celebrity Cruises Inc. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12954754, filed by Linda Metcoff. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Black, Stefanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Metcoff v. Celebrity Cruises Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celebrity Cruises Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Metcoff
Represented By: Stefanie Alicia Black
Represented By: Michael A. Winkleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?