ISLAND GARDENS DEEP HARBOUR LLC v. M/Y NIRVANA et al
Plaintiff: ISLAND GARDENS DEEP HARBOUR LLC
Defendant: Karl Specktor, M/Y NIRVANA and Nile Niami
Case Number: 1:2020cv22314
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael T. Moore on behalf of ISLAND GARDENS DEEP HARBOUR LLC. Attorney Michael T. Moore added to party ISLAND GARDENS DEEP HARBOUR LLC(pty:pla). (Moore, Michael)
June 24, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Nile Niami, Karl Specktor. (dj)
June 23, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Defendant Nile Niami by ISLAND GARDENS DEEP HARBOUR LLC re #1 Complaint, filed by ISLAND GARDENS DEEP HARBOUR LLC (Jaramillo, Christopher)
June 23, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Defendant Karl Spektor by ISLAND GARDENS DEEP HARBOUR LLC re #1 Complaint, filed by ISLAND GARDENS DEEP HARBOUR LLC (Jaramillo, Christopher)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 6/8/2020. See attached document for full details. (drz)
June 3, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (drz)
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KARL SPECKTOR, in personam, M/Y NIRVANA, NILE NIAMI in personam. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12976767, filed by ISLAND GARDENS DEEP HARBOUR LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Jaramillo, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ISLAND GARDENS DEEP HARBOUR LLC v. M/Y NIRVANA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karl Specktor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/Y NIRVANA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nile Niami
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ISLAND GARDENS DEEP HARBOUR LLC
Represented By: Christopher Robin Jaramillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?