FULL COMPLIANCE, LLC et al v. AMERANT BANK, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: FULL COMPLIANCE, LLC and ZAMORA & HERNANDEZ, PLLC
Defendant: Celtic Bank Corp., WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A., INTERAMERICAN BANK, A FSB, PROFESSIONAL BANK, PARADISE BANK, VALLEY NATIONAL BANK, BANKUNITED, N.A., J.P. MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A., TRUIST BANK, TD BANK, N.A., AMERANT BANK, N.A., LIVE OAK BANKING COMPANY, FIRST CITIZENS BANK & TRUST COMPANY, BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., CAMBRIDGE TRUST COMPANY, GROVE BANK & TRUST, FIRST HORIZON BANK, OCEAN BANK, CIBC BANK USA, REGIONS BANK and Celtic Bank Corp. doing business as Celtic Bank
Consolidated Plaintiff: Angela Williams
Case Number: 1:2020cv22339
Filed: June 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jose E Martinez
Referring Judge: Robert N Scola
2 Judge: Edwin G Torres
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ira Scott Silverstein on behalf of BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.. Attorney Ira Scott Silverstein added to party BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.(pty:dft). (Silverstein, Ira)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 PAPERLESS ORDER: granting the Defendant Bank of America's joint motion for an extension of time to respond to the complaint. #34 . The deadline for Bank of America to respond to the complaint is now August 31, 2020. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (dka)
July 30, 2020 Filing 34 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint,, Respond to Complaint by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Liebler, James)
July 30, 2020 Filing 33 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. identifying Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway Inc., Other Affiliate BANA Holding Corporation, Other Affiliate BAC North America Holding Company, Other Affiliate Bank of America Corporation, Other Affiliate NB Holdings Corporation for BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (Liebler, James)
July 30, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Randolph Liebler, II on behalf of BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.. Attorney James Randolph Liebler, II added to party BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.(pty:dft). (Liebler, James)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 PAPERLESS ORDER: requiring the Defendant Valley National Bank to respond to the parties' joint motion to stay pending the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ruling on a motion to transfer and consolidate this case. The Defendant must respond by August 6, 2020. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (dka)
July 29, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION to Stay Pending JPML Ruling and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by J.P. MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.. Attorney Eva Merian Spahn added to party J.P. MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.(pty:dft). Responses due by 8/12/2020 (Spahn, Eva)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 PAPERLESS ORDER granting the Defendant's motion to appear pro hac vice #26 . Attorney M. Laughlin Allen is given permission to appear and participate in this matter on behalf of the Defendant Truist Bank. The Clerk is directed to provide this attorney with notification of all electronic filings via the email address set forth in the motion. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (dka)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 PAPERLESS ORDER granting the Defendant's motion to appear pro hac vice #25 . Attorney Kathryn M. Barber is given permission to appear and participate in this matter on behalf of the Defendant Truist Bank. The Clerk is directed to provide this attorney with notification of all electronic filings via the email address set forth in the motion. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (dka)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 PAPERLESS ORDER granting the Defendant Truist Bank's motion to appear pro hac vice #24 . Attorney Cheryl L. Haas is given permission to appear and participate in this matter on behalf of the Defendant Truist Bank. The Clerk is directed to provide this attorney with notification of all electronic filings via the email address set forth in the motion. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (dka)
July 29, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for M. Laughlin Allen. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13261396 by TRUIST BANK. Responses due by 8/12/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rottmann, Emily)
July 29, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Kathryn M. Barber. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13261372 by TRUIST BANK. Responses due by 8/12/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rottmann, Emily)
July 29, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Cheryl L. Haas. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13261318 by TRUIST BANK. Responses due by 8/12/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rottmann, Emily)
July 29, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Emily Yandle Rottmann on behalf of TRUIST BANK. Attorney Emily Yandle Rottmann added to party TRUIST BANK(pty:dft). (Rottmann, Emily)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PAPERLESS ORDER: striking the Notice of Court Practice. 10 . Judge Darrin P. Gayles recused himself from this case #11 , and therefore his Notice of Court Practice is stricken. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (dka)
July 28, 2020 Filing 21 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint,, by VALLEY NATIONAL BANK. Responses due by 8/11/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Blum, William)
July 24, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melanie Sue Cherdack on behalf of VALLEY NATIONAL BANK. Attorney Melanie Sue Cherdack added to party VALLEY NATIONAL BANK(pty:dft). (Cherdack, Melanie)
July 17, 2020 Filing 19 Courtesy Copy of NOTICE OF RELATED ACTIONS filed before the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation re: MDL 2950 (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Related Actions, #2 Proof of Service)(mc)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order Consolidating Related Cases. Williams v. Bank of America, N.A. (Case No. 20-cv-61392) is consolidated with Full Compliance, LLC v. Amerant Bank, N.A. (Case No. 20-cv-22339). All future filings in these actions must be filed in case number 20cv-22339. The Clerk will administratively close Williams v. Bank of America, N.A. (Case No. 20-cv-61392). Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 7/14/2020. See attached document for full details. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-22339-RNS, 0:20-cv-61392-RNS (cds)
July 13, 2020 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ZAMORA & HERNANDEZ, PLLC, FULL COMPLIANCE, LLC. TRUIST BANK waiver sent on 6/18/2020, answer due 8/17/2020. (Popok, Michael)
July 13, 2020 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ZAMORA & HERNANDEZ, PLLC, FULL COMPLIANCE, LLC. J.P. MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. waiver sent on 6/29/2020, answer due 8/28/2020. (Popok, Michael)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER granting the Defendant's motion to appear pro hac vice #14 . Attorney Clark E. Alpert is given permission to appear and participate in this matter on behalf of the Defendant Valley National Bank. The Clerk is directed to provide this attorney with notification of all electronic filings via the email address set forth in the motion. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (dka)
July 13, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Clark E. Alpert. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13168946 by VALLEY NATIONAL BANK. Attorney William Barry Blum added to party VALLEY NATIONAL BANK(pty:dft). Responses due by 7/27/2020 (Blum, William)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCECURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 7/10/2020. See attached document for full details. (mdc)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference and Order Referring Discovery Matters to the Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 7/8/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Darrin P. Gayles recused. Case reassigned to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 7/8/2020. See attached document for full details. (vjk)
July 7, 2020 Filing 10 (STRICKEN PER DE#22)NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (bfk) Modified on 7/29/2020 (cqs).
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Jose E. Martinez recused. Case reassigned to Judge Darrin P. Gayles for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 7/6/2020. See attached document for full details. (vjk)
July 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint. Answer for INTERAMERICAN BANK due on or before 7/27/2020. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 7/3/2020. (jd00)
July 2, 2020 Filing 7 Clerks Notice to Filer re #6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint re #1 Complaint,,. Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls)
July 2, 2020 Filing 6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by INTERAMERICAN BANK, A FSB. Attorney Albert D Lichy added to party INTERAMERICAN BANK, A FSB(pty:dft). Responses due by 7/16/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lichy, Albert) Modified Relief on 7/2/2020 (ls).
June 5, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ZAMORA & HERNANDEZ, PLLC (Popok, Michael)
June 5, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FULL COMPLIANCE, LLC (Popok, Michael)
June 5, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to AMERANT BANK, N.A., BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., BANKUNITED, N.A., CAMBRIDGE TRUST COMPANY, CIBC BANK USA, Celtic Bank Corp., FIRST CITIZENS BANK & TRUST COMPANY, FIRST HORIZON BANK, GROVE BANK & TRUST, INTERAMERICAN BANK, A FSB, J.P. MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A., LIVE OAK BANKING COMPANY, OCEAN BANK, PARADISE BANK, PROFESSIONAL BANK, REGIONS BANK, TD BANK, N.A., TRUIST BANK, VALLEY NATIONAL BANK, WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.. (cds)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (cds)
June 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Full Compliance, LLC and Zamora & Hernandez, PLLC, individually and on behalf of similarly situated businesses and individuals, against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12987659, filed by ZAMORA & HERNANDEZ, PLLC, FULL COMPLIANCE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s), #5 Summon(s), #6 Summon(s), #7 Summon(s), #8 Summon(s), #9 Summon(s), #10 Summon(s), #11 Summon(s), #12 Summon(s), #13 Summon(s), #14 Summon(s), #15 Summon(s), #16 Summon(s), #17 Summon(s), #18 Summon(s), #19 Summon(s), #20 Summon(s), #21 Summon(s))(Popok, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FULL COMPLIANCE, LLC et al v. AMERANT BANK, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celtic Bank Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERAMERICAN BANK, A FSB
Represented By: Albert D Lichy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROFESSIONAL BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PARADISE BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VALLEY NATIONAL BANK
Represented By: William Barry Blum
Represented By: Clark E. Alpert
Represented By: Melanie Sue Cherdack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANKUNITED, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Represented By: Eva Merian Spahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRUIST BANK
Represented By: Cheryl L. Haas
Represented By: Kathryn M. Barber
Represented By: Emily Yandle Rottmann
Represented By: M. Laughlin Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD BANK, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERANT BANK, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIVE OAK BANKING COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIRST CITIZENS BANK & TRUST COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.
Represented By: James Randolph Liebler, II
Represented By: Ira Scott Silverstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAMBRIDGE TRUST COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GROVE BANK & TRUST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIRST HORIZON BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCEAN BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIBC BANK USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REGIONS BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celtic Bank Corp. doing business as Celtic Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FULL COMPLIANCE, LLC
Represented By: Michael Steven Popok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZAMORA & HERNANDEZ, PLLC
Represented By: Michael Steven Popok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Angela Williams
Represented By: Jason Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?