Manchinelli Granados, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Juan Carlos Arellano Jimenez v. HSBC BANK USA NA et al
Petitioner: Isaac Gabriel Manchinelli Granados, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Juan Carlos Arellano Jimenez
Respondent: HSBC Mexico, S.A., HSBC Private Bank, Institucion de Banca Multiple, HSBC North America Holdings, HSBC BANK USA NA and Grupo Financiero HSBC, S.A., de C.V.
Case Number: 1:2020cv22470
Filed: June 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jose E Martinez
Referring Judge: Alicia M Otazo-Reyes
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2020 Filing 25 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 8/12/2020 re #10 Renewed MOTION to Remand to State Court (including certificate pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a)(3)) filed by Isaac Gabriel Manchinelli Granados, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Juan Carlos Arellano Jimenez. Total time in court: 49 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Eduardo Enrique Bertran and Francesco Antonio Zincone, III appeared on behalf of the Petitioner. Sara Soto, Alex Joseph Sabo, II and Leonel Peraza, Jr. appeared on behalf of the Respondent. Order to follow. (Digital 13:29:24 - 14:17:39) (sl) .
August 11, 2020 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 Renewed MOTION to Remand to State Court (including certificate pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a)(3)) filed by Isaac Gabriel Manchinelli Granados, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Juan Carlos Arellano Jimenez. (Bertran, Eduardo)
August 7, 2020 Filing 23 Statement of: Undisputed Material Facts Pursuant to Local Rule 56.1 by HSBC BANK USA NA, HSBC Private Bank (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O)(Soto, Sara)
August 7, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION TO DISMISS #5 Amended Complaint,,,,,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or, in the alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law and Request for Hearing by HSBC BANK USA NA, HSBC Private Bank. Responses due by 8/21/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Soto, Sara)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PAPERLESS ORDER terminating HSBC North America Holdings from this case in light of the #20 notice of voluntary dismissal. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 8/7/2020. (jd00)
August 7, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of HSBC NORTH AMERICA HOLDINGS, N.A. only, without prejudice, by Isaac Gabriel Manchinelli Granados, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Juan Carlos Arellano Jimenez (Zincone, Francesco)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PAPERLESS ORDER Setting Telephonic Hearing on #10 Renewed MOTION to Remand to State Court for 8/12/2020 at 1:30 PM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. Counsel shall call the conference number 1-888-684-8852 at the appointed time, then enter access code 4791317 and security code 0812. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 8/5/2020. (gzu)
August 4, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 Renewed MOTION to Remand to State Court (including certificate pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a)(3)) OPPOSITION TO PETITIONERS MOTION FOR REMAND AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW AND REQUEST FOR HEARING filed by HSBC BANK USA NA, HSBC North America Holdings. Replies due by 8/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Peraza, Leonel)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time. Respondents shall have through and including August 7, 2020 to respond to the #5 Amended Petition for Declaratory Relief and Damages. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 7/23/2020. (jd00)
July 23, 2020 Filing 16 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #5 Amended Complaint,,,,,, Second Unopposed Motion for Further Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Petition for Declaratory Relief and Damages [DE 05] by HSBC BANK USA NA, HSBC North America Holdings. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peraza, Leonel)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #14 MOTION for Extension of Time. Response to #10 Renewed MOTION to Remand due by 8/4/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 7/20/2020. (gzu)
July 16, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #10 Renewed MOTION to Remand to State Court (including certificate pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a)(3)) Respondents HSBC Bank USA, N.A. and HSBC North America Holdings Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Petitioner's Renewed Motion for Remand [DE 10] by HSBC BANK USA NA, HSBC North America Holdings. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peraza, Leonel)
July 8, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE by HSBC BANK USA NA re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), of Consent to Removal (Soto, Sara)
July 7, 2020 Filing 12 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes per DE 11 ORDER REFERRING #10 Renewed Motion to Remand to State Court. Motions referred to Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. (vjk)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER REFERRING #10 Renewed Motion to Remand to State Court to Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 7/7/2020. (jd00)
July 7, 2020 Filing 10 Renewed MOTION to Remand to State Court (including certificate pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a)(3)) by Isaac Gabriel Manchinelli Granados, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Juan Carlos Arellano Jimenez. (Zincone, Francesco)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER denying without prejudice #8 Motion to Remand for failure to meet and confer per Southern District of Florida Local Rule 7.1(a)(3). Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 7/6/2020. (jd00)
July 3, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand by Isaac Gabriel Manchinelli Granados, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Juan Carlos Arellano Jimenez. (Zincone, Francesco)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to #5 Amended Complaint. Answer due 7/28/2020. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 7/2/2020. (jd00)
July 2, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #5 Amended Complaint,,,,,, Respondents' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Petition by HSBC BANK USA NA, HSBC North America Holdings. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peraza, Leonel)
June 23, 2020 Filing 5 First AMENDED COMPLAINT as a matter of course pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(A)(1) against Grupo Financiero HSBC, S.A., de C.V., HSBC BANK USA NA, HSBC Mexico, S.A., HSBC North America Holdings, HSBC Private Bank, Institucion de Banca Multiple, filed by Isaac Gabriel Manchinelli Granados, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Juan Carlos Arellano Jimenez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - October 28, 2019 Manchinelli Demand Letter to HSBC, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - April 21, 2020 Order Admitting Will of Non Resident to Probate and Appointing Personal Representative, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - April 21, 2020 Ancillary Letters of Administration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D-1 - March 7, 2005 Mexican Judgment (in original Spanish), #5 Exhibit Exhibit D-2 - March 7, 2005 Mexican Judgment (in translated English), #6 Exhibit Exhibit E-1 - January 20, 2011 Arellano Will (in original Spanish), #7 Exhibit Exhibit E-2 - January 20, 2011 Arellano Will (in translated English), #8 Exhibit Exhibit F-1 - November 11, 2012 Acceptance of Inheritance by Manchinelli (in original Spanish), #9 Exhibit Exhibit F-2 - November 11, 2012 Acceptance of Inheritance by Manchinelli (in translated English), #10 Exhibit Exhibit G-1 - May 25, 2015 Judicial Approval of Will (in original Spanish), #11 Exhibit Exhibit G-2 - May 25, 2015 Judicial Approval of Will (in translated English), #12 Exhibit Exhibit H - Composite Exhibit of October 23, 2019 Email Chain between Attorney Bertran and HSBC, #13 Exhibit Exhibit I - Composite Email of October 25, 2019 Emails, #14 Exhibit Exhibit J - November 1, 2019 Email from Ernesto Paredes to Eduardo Bertran)(Zincone, Francesco)
June 16, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by HSBC North America Holdings Notice of Filing Civil Cover Sheet (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Soto, Sara)
June 16, 2020 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (jbs)
June 15, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jbs)
June 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Petition for Declaratory Relief and Damages) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13031982, filed by HSBC North America Holdings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Soto, Sara)(No Motions to Dismiss/No Answer Filed) Modified text on 6/16/2020 (jbs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manchinelli Granados, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Juan Carlos Arellano Jimenez v. HSBC BANK USA NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: HSBC Mexico, S.A.
Represented By: Sara Soto
Represented By: Alex Joseph Sabo, II
Represented By: Leonel Peraza, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: HSBC Private Bank
Represented By: Sara Soto
Represented By: Alex Joseph Sabo, II
Represented By: Leonel Peraza, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Institucion de Banca Multiple
Represented By: Sara Soto
Represented By: Alex Joseph Sabo, II
Represented By: Leonel Peraza, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: HSBC North America Holdings
Represented By: Sara Soto
Represented By: Alex Joseph Sabo, II
Represented By: Leonel Peraza, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: HSBC BANK USA NA
Represented By: Sara Soto
Represented By: Alex Joseph Sabo, II
Represented By: Leonel Peraza, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Grupo Financiero HSBC, S.A., de C.V.
Represented By: Sara Soto
Represented By: Alex Joseph Sabo, II
Represented By: Leonel Peraza, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Isaac Gabriel Manchinelli Granados, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Juan Carlos Arellano Jimenez
Represented By: Jose Alfredo De Armas
Represented By: Louis Manuel Hillman-Waller
Represented By: Eduardo Enrique Bertran
Represented By: Francesco Antonio Zincone, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?