Brooks et al v. Ultra Enterprises Inc.
Plaintiff: Marcy Brooks
Defendant: Ultra Enterprises Inc.
Consolidated Plaintiff: Samuel Hernandez and Richard Montoure
Consolidated Defendant: Event Entertainment Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv22495
Filed: June 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jose E Martinez
Referring Judge: Robert N Scola
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court grants #15 the Plaintiffs' unopposed motion for an extension of time to respond to the Defendant's motion to compel arbitration and to dismiss the complaint. The Plaintiffs must respond on or before August 24, 2020. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (kbe)
August 5, 2020 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #14 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss the Amended Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Marcy Brooks, Samuel Hernandez, Richard Montoure. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order on Motion for Extension of Time)(Schachter, Adam)
July 27, 2020 Filing 14 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss the Amended Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Event Entertainment Group, Inc.. Responses due by 8/10/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sastre, Hildy)
July 20, 2020 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Event Entertainment Group, Inc., filed by Marcy Brooks, Richard Montoure, Samuel Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - March 31, 2019 Ticketing Terms and Conditions - Ultra Music Festival)(Schachter, Adam)
July 10, 2020 Set Answer Due Deadline per Order on DE #12 : Defendant's response to Amended Complaint due 7/27/2020.(Plainff's Amended Complaint due by 7/20/2020.) (jao)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Consolidate Cases. case has been consolidated with 1:20-cv-22185-RNS. All future filings in both actions must be submitted under case number 1:20-cv-22495-RNS. The Plaintiffs must file the amended complaint on or before July 20, 2020. The Defendant must thereafter respond to the consolidated amended complaint on or before July 27, 2020. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 7/10/2020. See attached document for full details. (jao)
July 9, 2020 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Ultra Enterprises Inc.. Responses due by 7/23/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Sastre, Hildy)
July 2, 2020 Filing 10 Certificate of Other Affiliates by Ultra Enterprises Inc. (Sastre, Hildy)
July 1, 2020 Filing 9 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Marcy Brooks (Corwin, Marcus)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr for all further proceedings, accepted and signed on 6/25/2020. Judge Jose E. Martinez and Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 6/25/2020. (mws)
June 24, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by Ultra Enterprises Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Rogers, Daniel)
June 24, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Ultra Enterprises Inc. (Rogers, Daniel)
June 22, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ultra Enterprises Inc. (Sastre, Hildy)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Civil Trial Date and Pretrial Schedule, Requiring Mediation, and Referring Certain Matters to Magistrate Judge: (Jury Trial set for 4/12/2021 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez., Calendar Call set for 4/8/2021 01:30 PM in Miami Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez.),(Mediation Deadline 1/8/2021.), Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 6/18/2020. See attached document for full details. (jbs) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
June 17, 2020 Filing 3 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Michael L. Mallow, mailing date June 17, 2020, (pt)
June 17, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao)
June 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Class Action Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13043061, filed by Ultra Enterprises Inc.. No Answer and/or Motion to Dismiss Filed. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8)(Sastre, Hildy) Modified on 6/17/2020 (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooks et al v. Ultra Enterprises Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ultra Enterprises Inc.
Represented By: Michael L. Mallow
Represented By: Daniel Brandon Rogers
Represented By: Katherine Grace Mastrucci
Represented By: Hildy M. Sastre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcy Brooks
Represented By: Marcus Wolf Corwin
Represented By: Adam Michael Schachter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Samuel Hernandez
Represented By: Bryan L. Clobes
Represented By: Andrew Jay Fuller
Represented By: Joseph G. Sauder
Represented By: Adam Michael Schachter
Represented By: Daniel O. Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Richard Montoure
Represented By: Bryan L. Clobes
Represented By: Andrew Jay Fuller
Represented By: Joseph G. Sauder
Represented By: Adam Michael Schachter
Represented By: Daniel O. Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Event Entertainment Group, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Brandon Rogers
Represented By: Katherine Grace Mastrucci
Represented By: Hildy M. Sastre
Represented By: Antar Kwaku Vaughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?