PATTERSON v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Plaintiff: DIMITRI PATTERSON
Defendant: Ashley Moody, Attorney General William P. Barr, DONALD J TRUMP, United States of America and Ron Desantis
Case Number: 1:2020cv22722
Filed: July 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Miami Office
Presiding Judge: Robert N Scola
Referring Judge: Edwin G Torres
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER of Dismissal Without Prejudice. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to close the case. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 7/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference and Order Referring Discovery Matters to the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 7/1/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Requiring Compliance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m). ( Miscellaneous Deadline 7/10/2020.) Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 7/1/2020. See attached document for full details. (lk)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 7/1/2020. See attached document for full details. (lk)
July 1, 2020 Filing 5 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jua)
July 1, 2020 Filing 4 Case transferred in from Florida Northern; Case Number 3:20-cv-04349. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(jua).
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ADOPTING #2 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. This action is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida. The clerk of the court is directed to close the case file. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 06/30/2020. (sdw)
June 30, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. (no objections filed) (sdw)
June 2, 2020 Filing 2 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. For the reasons set forth above, the undersigned respectfully RECOMMENDS: This case be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida. (Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 6/30/2020.) The clerk of the court close this file. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 6/2/2020. (jcw)
March 6, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #1 EMERGENCY MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (jcw)
March 6, 2020 Filing 1 EMERGENCY MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by DIMITRI PATTERSON. (Motion is not signed.) (jcw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PATTERSON v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Moody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General William P. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD J TRUMP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Desantis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIMITRI PATTERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?