Karaoglan v. Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Plaintiff: Gion Karaoglan
Defendant: Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv22795
Filed: July 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia G Cooke
Referring Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Gion Karaoglan. Celebrity Cruises, Inc. waiver sent on 7/28/2020, answer due 9/28/2020. (Rosenwater, Bruce)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 , #7 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorneys Jordan Bobrow and Peter Baron. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 7/9/2020. (jzn)
July 9, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jordan Bobrow. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13152428 by Gion Karaoglan. Responses due by 7/23/2020 (Rosenwater, Bruce)
July 8, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Peter Baron. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13148817 by Gion Karaoglan. Responses due by 7/22/2020 (Rosenwater, Bruce)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ENDORSED ORDER Regarding Phone Calls to Chambers. The following rules apply in this and all other civil matters pending before Judge Marcia G. Cooke: 1. Do not call Chambers to ask about the status of pending motions, including motions for extension of time. The Court is aware of all pending motions and will address each of them in due course. 2. Do not call Chambers if the information you seek, or seek to provide, can be conveyed through a filing on the docket. 3. Do not call Chambers if the information you seek is available from other sources, including Court Orders and the Local Rules. 4. If you call Chambers for a permissible purpose, counsel for all affected parties must be on the line. Calls from non-attorneys and ex parte calls will not be accepted. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 7/8/2020. (kou)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 7/8/2020. See attached document for full details. (kou)
July 8, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Celebrity Cruises, Inc.. (jao)
July 7, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao)
July 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Celebrity Cruises, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13141805, filed by Gion Karaoglan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Rosenwater, Bruce)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Karaoglan v. Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gion Karaoglan
Represented By: Bruce Scott Rosenwater
Represented By: Peter D. Baron
Represented By: Jordan R. Bobrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?