Martinez v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Maira Martinez
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security and Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2020cv22812
Filed: July 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: John J O'Sullivan
Referring Judge: Ursula Ungaro
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:0402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney served on 7/13/2020, answer due 9/11/2020. (kpe)
July 10, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Compliance re #5 Order. Copies of Summonses and Complaint forward to the U.S. Marshal for Service. (kpe)
July 10, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of the Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (kpe)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Granting to the extent that the plaintiff need not prepay even a partial filing fee in this case, or to prepay costs such as for service of process. USM Service ordered . Summonses provided for issuance by Clerk for USM Service. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Maira Martinez. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 7/10/2020. See attached document for full details. (tro)
July 9, 2020 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. The motion to proceed in forma pauperis is pending (kpe)
July 8, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Maira Martinez. (kpe)
July 8, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro and Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pursuant to the Clerks directive of this cause, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (kpe)
July 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security. Filing fees $ 400.00. IFP Filed, filed by Maira Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) USAG, #3 Summon(s) COMMISSIONER SSA, #4 Summon(s) USA SD FL, #5 Affidavit IFP Motion and Affidavit, #6 Supplement USM Form USAG, #7 Supplement USM Form COMMISSIONER SSA, #8 Supplement USM From USA SD FL)Case restricted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2. (Freeman, Heather)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Represented By: Noticing Social Security US Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maira Martinez
Represented By: Heather Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?