Medmarc Casualty Insurance Company et al v. Yanowitch et al
Plaintiff: Medmarc Casualty Insurance Company and NOETIC SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: Juan Poch Vives and Peter J. Yanowitch
Case Number: 1:2020cv22822
Filed: July 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Darrin P Gayles
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to #1 Complaint, by Peter J. Yanowitch filed by Medmarc Casualty Insurance Company, NOETIC SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Jurman, Rory)
August 7, 2020 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to #1 Complaint, for Defendant Juan Poch Vives filed by Medmarc Casualty Insurance Company, NOETIC SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Jurman, Rory)
August 3, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Juan Poch Vives. (kpe)
August 3, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Medmarc Casualty Insurance Company, NOETIC SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Vives) (Jurman, Rory)
July 31, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Peter J. Yanowitch. (kpe)
July 31, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Medmarc Casualty Insurance Company, NOETIC SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Yanowitch) (Jurman, Rory)
July 13, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01)
July 9, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (kpe)
July 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Juan Poch Vives, Peter J. Yanowitch. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13154453, filed by Medmarc Casualty Insurance Company, NOETIC SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jurman, Rory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medmarc Casualty Insurance Company et al v. Yanowitch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Medmarc Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Rory Eric Jurman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NOETIC SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Rory Eric Jurman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Poch Vives
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter J. Yanowitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?