Kendall Ice Arena v. National Casualty Company et al
Plaintiff: Kendall Ice Arena
Defendant: Hartford Steam Boiler Inspection and Insurance Company and National Casualty Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv22824
Filed: July 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia G Cooke
Referring Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Filing 19 Notice and NON-CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge . Filed by Kendall Ice Arena (Lozier, Gina)
August 28, 2020 Filing 18 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Kendall Ice Arena (Lozier, Gina)
July 24, 2020 Filing 17 Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement by National Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company for National Casualty Company (Miele, Joseph)
July 21, 2020 Filing 16 Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hartford Steam Boiler Inspection and Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Munich Reinsurance America, Inc., Corporate Parent Munich Re Group/Munchener Rueckversicherungs for Hartford Steam Boiler Inspection and Insurance Company (Keller, Thomas)
July 21, 2020 Filing 15 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Hartford Steam Boiler Inspection and Insurance Company (Keller, Thomas)
July 17, 2020 Filing 14 Amended ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Hartford Steam Boiler Inspection and Insurance Company. (Keller, Thomas)
July 17, 2020 Filing 13 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Kendall Ice Arena (Gaukroger, Gavin)
July 17, 2020 Filing 12 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Kendall Ice Arena. Attorney Gavin Cunningham Gaukroger added to party Kendall Ice Arena(pty:pla). (Gaukroger, Gavin)
July 16, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by National Casualty Company. (Miele, Joseph)
July 15, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Hartford Steam Boiler Inspection and Insurance Company. (Keller, Thomas)
July 15, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has not updated address and/or email information for attorney Madelyn Rodriguez re #6 Notice of Change of Address. After filing a Notice of Change of Address, Attorney Madelyn Rodriguez is instructed to go to their PACER account, Manage My Account, to complete the process of updating their information. (pt)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMANS DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 7/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (drz)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 7/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (drz)
July 14, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by Madelyn Rodriguez (Rodriguez, Madelyn)
July 14, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by National Casualty Company of Consent to Removal. Attorney Joseph Richard Miele, Jr added to party National Casualty Company(pty:dft). (Miele, Joseph)
July 10, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Compliance of Filing Fees $400.00, receipt number AFLSDC-13158596 re 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case (Keller, Thomas)
July 10, 2020 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Filing fees not paid. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Compliance of Filing Fee, and electronically pay the correct fees of $400.00 within 24 hours of this notice. (drz)
July 9, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (drz)
July 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint for Breach of Contract) Filing fee $400.00 not paid/no ifp filed filed by Hartford Steam Boiler Inspection and Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Coversheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Keller, Thomas) Modified on 7/10/2020 (drz). Modified on 7/10/2020 (drz).(No Answer of Affirmative Defenses Filed in State Court) Modified text on 7/10/2020 to reflect Exhibit C instead of Errata C (bb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kendall Ice Arena v. National Casualty Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendall Ice Arena
Represented By: Madelyn Rodriguez
Represented By: Gina Clausen Lozier
Represented By: Gavin Cunningham Gaukroger
Represented By: Christopher Bernard Choquette
Represented By: Michael Jerome Higer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Steam Boiler Inspection and Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas Anthony Keller
Represented By: Kristin Wood Elza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Casualty Company
Represented By: Joseph Richard Miele, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?