Ortiz Torres v. Warden et al
Plaintiff: Jose D Ortiz Torres
Defendant: Sgt. A. Gustton, Medical Private Company / Century I, Assistant Warden, Warden, Secretary of Department of Corrections, Sgt S. Lawrence, Officers, Staff and Captain S. Terresell
Case Number: 1:2020cv22852
Filed: July 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Lisette M Reid
Referring Judge: Robert N Scola
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO AMEND COMPLAINT. (Amended Complaint due by 9/16/2020.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 8/26/2020. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 Complaint for Violation of Civil Rights Form) (daa)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to the extent that the plaintiff need not prepay even a partial filing fee in this case, or to prepay costs such as for service of process. The plaintiff owes the United States a debt of $350.00 which must be paid to the Clerk of the Court as funds become available. USM Service NOT Ordered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 8/26/2020. See attached document for full details. (daa)
July 31, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jose D Ortiz Torres. (kpe)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING PAYMENT OF FILING FEE OR FILING OF MOTION TO PROCEED IFP WITH FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT. Filing Fee due by 7/31/2020. Motions due by 7/31/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 7/17/2020. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 IFP form) (br)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE CIVL RIGHTS LITIGANTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 7/17/2020. See attached document for full details. (br)
July 13, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (pcs)
July 13, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against Assistant Warden, A. Gustton, S. Lawrence, Medical Private Company / Century I, Officers, Secretary of Department of Corrections, Staff, S. Terresell, Warden. Filing fee $ 400.00 Not Paid/No IFP, filed by Jose D Ortiz Torres.(pcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortiz Torres v. Warden et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. A. Gustton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Private Company / Century I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assistant Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt S. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain S. Terresell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose D Ortiz Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?