Olivera v. Saul
Plaintiff: Belkis Olivera
Defendant: Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security and Andrew Saul
Case Number: 1:2020cv22881
Filed: July 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Referring Judge: Lauren Fleischer Louis
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:0205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Belkis Olivera. Andrew Saul served on 8/24/2020, answer due 10/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service)(Palacios-Paredes, Katherine)
August 24, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Belkis Olivera. Andrew Saul served on 8/20/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service)(Palacios-Paredes, Katherine)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE. Within seven (7) days of perfecting service upon Defendant, Plaintiff shall file proof of such service with the Court. Failure to effectuate service of a summons and the complaint on Defendant by the stated deadline will result in dismissal without prejudice and without further notice. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 8/17/2020. See attached document for full details. (amb)
July 14, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Katherine Olivia Palacios-Paredes on behalf of Belkis Olivera. Attorney Katherine Olivia Palacios-Paredes added to party Belkis Olivera(pty:pla). (Palacios-Paredes, Katherine)
July 14, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney, William Barr. (amb)
July 13, 2020 Filing 4 Clerks Notice of Magistrate Judge Assignment to Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis. Pursuant to the Clerks directive of this cause, this matter is referred for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (amb)
July 13, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
July 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Belkis Olivera against Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13171503, filed by Belkis Olivera. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))Case restricted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2. (Oliver, Rogelio)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olivera v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Noticing Social Security US Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Belkis Olivera
Represented By: Rogelio Ramon Oliver
Represented By: Katherine Olivia Palacios-Paredes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?