AE Management, LLC et al v. Illinois Union Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: AE Coral Springs, LLC, AE Management, LLC, AE Aventura, LLC, ADL Restaurant, LLC, AE Oakland Bakery and Trattoria, LLC, AE Restaurant Group, Inc., Italica Ristorante, Inc., Angelos Wine Bar Weston, LLC, AE Addison Place, LLC and AE Restaurant Enterprises, LLC
Defendant: Chubb National Insurance Company and Illinois Union Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv22925
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Robert N Scola
Referring Judge: Edwin G Torres
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Filing 25 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chubb National Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Chubb Limited, Corporate Parent Chubb Group Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Chubb INA Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Federal Insurance Company for Chubb National Insurance Company (Daechsel, Andrew)
August 24, 2020 Filing 24 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Illinois Union Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent INA Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent ACE American Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Chubb Limited, Corporate Parent INA Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent INA Corporation, Corporate Parent Chubb Group Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Chubb INA Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Pacific Employers Insurance Company for Illinois Union Insurance Company (Daechsel, Andrew)
August 20, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Kenneth Daechsel on behalf of Chubb National Insurance Company, Illinois Union Insurance Company. Attorney Andrew Kenneth Daechsel added to party Chubb National Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Kenneth Daechsel added to party Illinois Union Insurance Company(pty:dft). (Daechsel, Andrew)
August 20, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Heidi Hudson Raschke on behalf of Chubb National Insurance Company, Illinois Union Insurance Company. Attorney Heidi Hudson Raschke added to party Chubb National Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Heidi Hudson Raschke added to party Illinois Union Insurance Company(pty:dft). (Raschke, Heidi)
August 20, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Jeffrey Brodie on behalf of Chubb National Insurance Company, Illinois Union Insurance Company. Attorney Steven Jeffrey Brodie added to party Chubb National Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Jeffrey Brodie added to party Illinois Union Insurance Company(pty:dft). (Brodie, Steven)
August 6, 2020 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Angelos Wine Bar Weston, LLC, AE Restaurant Enterprises, LLC, AE Addison Place, LLC, AE Oakland Bakery and Trattoria, LLC, AE Restaurant Group, Inc., AE Coral Springs, LLC, Italica Ristorante, Inc., AE Management, LLC, AE Aventura, LLC, ADL Restaurant, LLC. Chubb National Insurance Company waiver sent on 8/6/2020, answer due 10/5/2020. (Ku, Brian)
August 5, 2020 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Angelos Wine Bar Weston, LLC, AE Restaurant Enterprises, LLC, AE Addison Place, LLC, AE Oakland Bakery and Trattoria, LLC, AE Restaurant Group, Inc., AE Coral Springs, LLC, Italica Ristorante, Inc., AE Management, LLC, AE Aventura, LLC, ADL Restaurant, LLC. Illinois Union Insurance Company waiver sent on 8/4/2020, answer due 10/5/2020. (Ku, Brian)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDRUES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 7/23/2020. See attached document for full details. (mdc)
July 22, 2020 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to Chubb National Insurance Company, Illinois Union Insurance Company. (pes)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court grants #13 and #14 counsels' motions to appear pro hac vice. Attorneys Allan Kanner and Cynthia St. Amant are given permission to appear and participate in this matter on behalf of the Plaintiffs. The Clerk is directed to provide these attorneys with notification of all electronic filings via the email addresses set forth in the motion. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (kbe)
July 21, 2020 Filing 15 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Chubb National Insurance Company, Illinois Union Insurance Company, filed by Angelos Wine Bar Weston, LLC, AE Restaurant Enterprises, LLC, AE Addison Place, LLC, AE Oakland Bakery and Trattoria, LLC, AE Restaurant Group, Inc., AE Coral Springs, LLC, Italica Ristorante, Inc., AE Management, LLC, AE Aventura, LLC, ADL Restaurant, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy, #2 Exhibit B - Declination of Coverage Letter, #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s))(Ku, Brian)
July 21, 2020 Filing 14 Renewed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Cynthia St. Amant. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Amended/Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed - Filing Fees Previously Paid. See #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,, by ADL Restaurant, LLC, AE Addison Place, LLC, AE Aventura, LLC, AE Coral Springs, LLC, AE Management, LLC, AE Oakland Bakery and Trattoria, LLC, AE Restaurant Enterprises, LLC, AE Restaurant Group, Inc., Angelos Wine Bar Weston, LLC, Italica Ristorante, Inc.. Responses due by 8/4/2020 (Ku, Brian)
July 21, 2020 Filing 13 Renewed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Allan Kanner. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Amended/Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed - Filing Fees Previously Paid. See #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,, by ADL Restaurant, LLC, AE Addison Place, LLC, AE Aventura, LLC, AE Coral Springs, LLC, AE Management, LLC, AE Oakland Bakery and Trattoria, LLC, AE Restaurant Enterprises, LLC, AE Restaurant Group, Inc., Angelos Wine Bar Weston, LLC, Italica Ristorante, Inc.. Responses due by 8/4/2020 (Ku, Brian)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court denies, without prejudice, #10 and #11 counsel's motions to appear pro hac vice. As the Clerk of Court has advised the Court, the motions do not comply with Local Rule 4(b) of the Rules Governing the Admission, Practice, Peer Review, and Discipline in that local counsel did not consent to electronically serve all documents and things that may be served electronically or consent to serving documents in compliance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. A sample motion can be found on the Court's website. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (kbe)
July 17, 2020 Filing 11 Plaintiff's MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Cynthia St. Amant. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13199015 by ADL Restaurant, LLC, AE Addison Place, LLC, AE Aventura, LLC, AE Coral Springs, LLC, AE Management, LLC, AE Oakland Bakery and Trattoria, LLC, AE Restaurant Enterprises, LLC, AE Restaurant Group, Inc., Angelos Wine Bar Weston, LLC, Italica Ristorante, Inc.. Responses due by 7/31/2020 (Ku, Brian)
July 17, 2020 Filing 10 Plaintiff's MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Allan Kanner. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13198969 by ADL Restaurant, LLC, AE Addison Place, LLC, AE Aventura, LLC, AE Coral Springs, LLC, AE Management, LLC, AE Oakland Bakery and Trattoria, LLC, AE Restaurant Enterprises, LLC, AE Restaurant Group, Inc., Angelos Wine Bar Weston, LLC, Italica Ristorante, Inc.. Responses due by 7/31/2020 (Ku, Brian)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Requiring Amended Complaint, ( Amended Complaint due by 7/24/2020.) Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 7/16/2020. See attached document for full details. (jao)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference and Order Referring Discovery Matters to the Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 7/16/2020. See attached document for full details. (jao)
July 16, 2020 Filing 7 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Allan Kanner and Cynthia St. Amant, mailing date July 16, 2020, (pt)
July 15, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by ADL Restaurant, LLC, AE Addison Place, LLC, AE Aventura, LLC, AE Coral Springs, LLC, AE Management, LLC, AE Oakland Bakery and Trattoria, LLC, AE Restaurant Enterprises, LLC, AE Restaurant Group, Inc., Angelos Wine Bar Weston, LLC, Italica Ristorante, Inc. re 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Ku, Brian)
July 15, 2020 Filing 5 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Venue on the Civil Cover Sheet does not match the initiating document. The Clerks Office confirmed Miami-Dade (Office - Miami) as the county with the filer. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (jao)
July 15, 2020 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (jao)
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Chubb National Insurance Company, Illinois Union Insurance Company. (jao)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chubb National Insurance Company, Illinois Union Insurance Company. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13186175, filed by Angelos Wine Bar Weston, LLC, AE Restaurant Enterprises, LLC, AE Addison Place, LLC, AE Oakland Bakery and Trattoria, LLC, AE Restaurant Group, Inc., AE Coral Springs, LLC, Italica Ristorante, Inc., AE Management, LLC, AE Aventura, LLC, ADL Restaurant, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy, #2 Exhibit B - Declination of Coverage Letter, #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s))(Ku, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AE Management, LLC et al v. Illinois Union Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AE Coral Springs, LLC
Represented By: Louis I. Mussman
Represented By: Brian Tse-Hua Ku
Represented By: Allan Kanner
Represented By: Cynthia St. Amant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AE Management, LLC
Represented By: Louis I. Mussman
Represented By: Brian Tse-Hua Ku
Represented By: Allan Kanner
Represented By: Cynthia St. Amant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AE Aventura, LLC
Represented By: Louis I. Mussman
Represented By: Brian Tse-Hua Ku
Represented By: Allan Kanner
Represented By: Cynthia St. Amant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADL Restaurant, LLC
Represented By: Louis I. Mussman
Represented By: Brian Tse-Hua Ku
Represented By: Allan Kanner
Represented By: Cynthia St. Amant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AE Oakland Bakery and Trattoria, LLC
Represented By: Louis I. Mussman
Represented By: Brian Tse-Hua Ku
Represented By: Allan Kanner
Represented By: Cynthia St. Amant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AE Restaurant Group, Inc.
Represented By: Louis I. Mussman
Represented By: Brian Tse-Hua Ku
Represented By: Allan Kanner
Represented By: Cynthia St. Amant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Italica Ristorante, Inc.
Represented By: Louis I. Mussman
Represented By: Brian Tse-Hua Ku
Represented By: Allan Kanner
Represented By: Cynthia St. Amant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelos Wine Bar Weston, LLC
Represented By: Louis I. Mussman
Represented By: Brian Tse-Hua Ku
Represented By: Allan Kanner
Represented By: Cynthia St. Amant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AE Addison Place, LLC
Represented By: Louis I. Mussman
Represented By: Brian Tse-Hua Ku
Represented By: Allan Kanner
Represented By: Cynthia St. Amant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AE Restaurant Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Louis I. Mussman
Represented By: Brian Tse-Hua Ku
Represented By: Allan Kanner
Represented By: Cynthia St. Amant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chubb National Insurance Company
Represented By: Andrew Kenneth Daechsel
Represented By: Steven Jeffrey Brodie
Represented By: Heidi Hudson Raschke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois Union Insurance Company
Represented By: Andrew Kenneth Daechsel
Represented By: Steven Jeffrey Brodie
Represented By: Heidi Hudson Raschke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?