Conden v. Royal Caribbean Group, LTD
Plaintiff: Colleen Conden
Defendant: Royal Caribbean Group, LTD and Scootaround, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv22956
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Referring Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Filing 21 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #15 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Colleen Conden. Scootaround, Inc. served on 9/4/2020, answer due 9/25/2020. (Aronfeld, Spencer)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Sarah Clasby Engel, Esq. Mediation Hearing set for 12/3/2020 10:00 AM. The parties are reminded that a report of their mediation must be filed within seven (7) days thereafter. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/31/2020. See attached document for full details. (wc)
August 31, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Sarah Clasby Engel as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 12/3/2020 at 10:00 a.m.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Aronfeld, Spencer)
August 31, 2020 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to Scootaround, Inc.. (ls)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER that on or before September 21, 2020, Plaintiff shall perfect service upon the Defendant, Scootaround, Inc., or show cause why this Defendant should not be dismissed for failure to perfect service of process. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/31/2020. See attached document for full details. (wc)
August 28, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Colleen Conden re #15 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal filed by Colleen Conden (Aronfeld, Spencer)
August 28, 2020 Filing 15 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Royal Caribbean Group, LTD, Scootaround, Inc., filed by Colleen Conden.(Hayashi, Matthias)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 8/26/2020. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
August 11, 2020 Filing 13 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Royal Caribbean Group, LTD (Sullivan, Elisha)
August 11, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Striking #9 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd. by Royal Caribbean Group, LTD (Sullivan, Elisha)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE - ( Jury Trial set for 7/5/2021 before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga., Calendar Call set for 6/29/2021 9:00 AM before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 3/15/2021.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/11/2020. See attached document for full details. (scn) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
August 10, 2020 Filing 10 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates by Colleen Conden identifying Other Affiliate CIGNA for Colleen Conden (Aronfeld, Spencer)
August 10, 2020 Filing 9 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Royal Caribbean Group, LTD identifying Corporate Parent Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD. for Royal Caribbean Group, LTD (Sullivan, Elisha)
August 10, 2020 Filing 8 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Royal Caribbean Group, LTD (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order)(Sullivan, Elisha)
August 6, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jerry Dean Hamilton on behalf of Royal Caribbean Group, LTD. Attorney Jerry Dean Hamilton added to party Royal Caribbean Group, LTD(pty:dft). (Hamilton, Jerry)
July 31, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elisha Sullivan on behalf of Royal Caribbean Group, LTD. Attorney Elisha Sullivan added to party Royal Caribbean Group, LTD(pty:dft). (Sullivan, Elisha)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties due by 9/28/2020. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 7/22/2020. See attached document for full details. (wc)
July 22, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Colleen Conden. Royal Caribbean Group, LTD waiver sent on 7/21/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. (Aronfeld, Spencer)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Royal Caribbean Group, LTD. (mc)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (mc)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Royal Caribbean Group, LTD. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13198875, filed by Colleen Conden. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Aronfeld, Spencer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conden v. Royal Caribbean Group, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Caribbean Group, LTD
Represented By: Elisha Sullivan
Represented By: Jerry Dean Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scootaround, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colleen Conden
Represented By: Matthias Masayasu Hayashi
Represented By: Spencer Marc Aronfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?