LUIS v. VMSB, LLC
Plaintiff: ROLANDO LUIS
Defendant: VMSB, LLC doing business as CASA CASUARINA doing business as GIANNIS
Case Number: 1:2020cv22958
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Darrin P Gayles
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29:0621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Filing 8 Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint Defendant's Answer to First Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses and Unopposed Motion to Strike Portions of the First Amended Complaint by VMSB, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thompson, Eric)
August 26, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ROLANDO LUIS, filed by ROLANDO LUIS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Palma, Zandro)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER granting Defendant's #5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before August 31, 2020. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (bfk)
August 14, 2020 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by VMSB, LLC. Attorney Eric Robert Thompson added to party VMSB, LLC(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thompson, Eric)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (bfk)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to VMSB, LLC. (pcs)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against VMSB, LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13199604, filed by ROLANDO LUIS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summon(s))(Palma, Zandro)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LUIS v. VMSB, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROLANDO LUIS
Represented By: Zandro E. Palma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VMSB, LLC doing business as CASA CASUARINA doing business as GIANNIS
Represented By: Eric Robert Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?