LaChase v. Facebook
Plaintiff: Charlton LaChase
Defendant: Facebook
Case Number: 1:2020cv22960
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Darrin P Gayles
Referring Judge: Lisette M Reid
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Inquiry by Charlton LaChase. (Copy of Docket Sheet and Complaint form was mailed) (jbs)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Complaint, [ 1], is DISMISSED. Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #6 , is DENIED. If he so chooses, Plaintiff must file his amended complaint as to the Title III claim on or before September 18, 2020. Administratively Closing Case. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 8/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (jbs)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Charlton LaChase. (jbs)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PAPERLESS ORDER denying without prejudice #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Although plaintiff purported to file his prison trust account statement, it is not a trust fund account statement obtained from the appropriate official at his current prison that shows his deposits, withdraws, and balance for the "6-month period immediately preceding the filing of the complaint." See 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 7/24/2020. (js05)
July 23, 2020 Filing 4 Notice to Update my Statement on Waiver Fee by Charlton LaChase re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (jbs)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Charlton LaChase. (ebz)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against Facebook. Filing fee $ 400.00. IFP Motion Filed/No Monies Paid, filed by Charlton LaChase.(ebz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LaChase v. Facebook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlton LaChase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?