Chambers v. Abora Homes LLC
Plaintiff: Delroy A. Chambers, Jr.
Defendant: Abora Homes LLC doing business as Abora Realty
Case Number: 1:2020cv22966
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:0405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Delroy A. Chambers, Jr (Heller, Shawn)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE. Any pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/10/2020. See attached document for full details. (wc)
August 8, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Settlement by Delroy A. Chambers, Jr (Heller, Shawn)
August 6, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Delroy A. Chambers, Jr. (Heller, Shawn)
August 6, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Striking #5 Summons Returned Executed filed by Delroy A. Chambers, Jr. by Delroy A. Chambers, Jr (Heller, Shawn)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties due by 8/28/2020. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/6/2020. See attached document for full details. (wc)
August 6, 2020 Filing 6 Clerks Notice to Filer re #5 Summons Returned Executed. Document Not Captioned; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - The Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then refile the document with the proper caption pursuant to Local Rules. (ls)
August 6, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Delroy A. Chambers, Jr. Abora Homes LLC served on 7/24/2020, answer due 8/14/2020. (Heller, Shawn)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER requiring service be perfected by 10/15/2020. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/5/2020. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Abora Homes LLC. (scn)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (scn)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Abora Homes LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13201137, filed by Delroy A. Chambers, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Heller, Shawn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chambers v. Abora Homes LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delroy A. Chambers, Jr.
Represented By: Shawn Alex Heller
Represented By: Joshua Aaron Glickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abora Homes LLC doing business as Abora Realty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?