Lynch et al v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Appellee: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, GMAC Mortgage Corporation and Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Appellant: Michael D. Lynch and Candence B Lynch
Case Number: 1:2020cv23021
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER that this appeal is DISMISSED as moot. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/9/2020. See attached document for full details. (wc)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying as moot #18 Appellants' Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time to File Initial Brief. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/24/2020. See attached document for full details. (wc)
August 21, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Initial Brief by Michael D. Lynch. Responses due by 9/4/2020 (amb) Text Modified on 8/24/2020 (amb).
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER that Appellants shall file their initial brief no later than September 18, 2020. The failure to comply will result in a dismissal of this appeal for failure to prosecute. The August 12, 2020 Order [ECF No. 14] is SET ASIDE. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/20/2020. See attached document for full details. (wc)
August 19, 2020 Filing 16 Bankruptcy Notice of Entry pursuant to Rule 8018 and NOTICE TO ATTORNEY - Pursuant to the Southern District of Florida Local Rules, and the Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure, the Appellant has 30 days after the docketing of the Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court to serve and file a brief. The Appellee shall serve and file a response brief within 30 days after service of Appellant's brief. The Appellant shall serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of the Appelle's brief. Appellant Brief due by 9/18/2020. (jc)
August 19, 2020 Filing 15 Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Candence B Lynch, Michael D. Lynch (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Appellant's Designation)(dcn)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 (SET ASIDE by DE#17 .) ORDER that Appellants shall file their initial brief no later than August 21, 2020. The failure to comply will result in a dismissal of this appeal for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/12/2020. See attached document for full details. (wc) Modified to reflect "set aside on 8/20/2020 (wc).
August 6, 2020 Filing 13 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC identifying Other Affiliate PHH Corporation, Other Affiliate PHH Mortgage Corporation, successor by merger to Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC for Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC (Samsing, Erik)
August 6, 2020 Filing 12 Clerks Notice to Filer re #11 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents Not Entered; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter ALL the missing Other Affiliates/Corp Parents. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. (ail)
August 5, 2020 Filing 11 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC (Samsing, Erik)
August 5, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Erik Tyler Samsing on behalf of Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. Attorney Erik Tyler Samsing added to party Deutsche Bank National Trust Company(pty:e), Attorney Erik Tyler Samsing added to party Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC(pty:e). (Samsing, Erik)
August 3, 2020 Filing 9 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction re #7 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Document Restricted Due to Error; See DE #8 for the correct document. (amb)
August 3, 2020 Filing 8 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Michael D. Lynch identifying Other Affiliate PHH Mortgage Corporation, Other Affiliate Glenn Glover, Other Affiliate A. Jay Cristol, Other Affiliate Jason Bushby, Other Affiliate Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP for Michael D. Lynch (amb)
August 3, 2020 Filing 7 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Michael D. Lynch (amb)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REQUIRING CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. By August 5, 2020, the parties, including governmental parties, must file certificates of interested parties and corporate disclosure statements that contain a complete list of persons, associated persons, firms, partnerships, or corporations that have a financial interest in the outcome of this case, including subsidiaries, conglomerates, affiliates, parent corporations, and other identifiable legal entities related to a party. Throughout the pendency of the action, the parties are under a continuing obligation to amend, correct, and update the certificates. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 7/22/2020. See attached document for full details. (wc)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER PROVIDING INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANTS. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 7/22/2020. See attached document for full details. (wc)
July 22, 2020 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice to Parties Re Administrative Order 2015-9 and Amendments to Federal Bankruptcy Rules and Local Rule 87.4 Re Processing of Bankruptcy Appeals (jc)
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jc)
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Transmittal of #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Candence B Lynch, Michael D. Lynch (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(dcn)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT (received), Bankruptcy Court case number 13-1712-AJC, filed by Michael D. Lynch, Candence B Lynch.(dcn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lynch et al v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Glenn E. Glover
Represented By: Jason R Bushby
Represented By: Erik Tyler Samsing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: GMAC Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Glenn E. Glover
Represented By: Jason R Bushby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Glenn E. Glover
Represented By: Jason R Bushby
Represented By: Erik Tyler Samsing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Michael D. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Candence B Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?