Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Pereira Pestana et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Celso Pereira Pestana, NPJ GROUP CORPORATION doing business as Friends Market & Bistro and Jose M. Pereira Pestana
Case Number: 1:2020cv23024
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Raag Singhal
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 17:0501
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF DISMISSAL re #14 Joint Stipulation and Order of Dismissal. This cause is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case and DENY AS MOOT any pending motions. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 9/18/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc)
September 18, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Giles, Brian)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order Administratively Closing Case. Any pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. Motions terminated: #11 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, Or For A More Definite Statement filed by Jose M. Pereira Pestana, NPJ GROUP CORPORATION, Celso Pereira Pestana. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 9/11/2020. See attached document for full details. (drz)
September 11, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Settlement by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Giles, Brian)
August 27, 2020 Filing 11 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, Or For A More Definite Statement by NPJ GROUP CORPORATION, Celso Pereira Pestana, Jose M. Pereira Pestana. Responses due by 9/10/2020 (Espinosa, Jorge)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document. Response/Answer due 8/31/2020. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 8/13/2020. (eca)
August 13, 2020 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by NPJ GROUP CORPORATION, Celso Pereira Pestana, Jose M. Pereira Pestana. Attorney Jorge Tadeo Espinosa added to party NPJ GROUP CORPORATION(pty:dft), Attorney Jorge Tadeo Espinosa added to party Celso Pereira Pestana(pty:dft), Attorney Jorge Tadeo Espinosa added to party Jose M. Pereira Pestana(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Espinosa, Jorge)
July 22, 2020 Filing 8 FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE (Copy of AO 121 Form and Complaint Mailed to U.S. Copyright Office). (drz)
July 22, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Jose M. Pereira Pestana. (drz)
July 22, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Celso Pereira Pestana. (drz)
July 22, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to NPJ GROUP CORPORATION. (drz)
July 22, 2020 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Alias Not Added. The Filer failed to add the alias information for the party(ies). The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (drz)
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (drz)
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Raag Singhal. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (drz)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NPJ Group Corporation , Celso Pereira Pestana, Jose M. Pereira Pestana. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13223016, filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc., a Foreign Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s))(Giles, Brian) Modified on 7/22/2020 (drz).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Pereira Pestana et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celso Pereira Pestana
Represented By: Jorge Tadeo Espinosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NPJ GROUP CORPORATION doing business as Friends Market & Bistro
Represented By: Jorge Tadeo Espinosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose M. Pereira Pestana
Represented By: Jorge Tadeo Espinosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Thomas Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?