Paterno v. Celebrity Cruises Inc.
Plaintiff: Janet Paterno
Defendant: Celebrity Cruises Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv23040
Filed: July 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia G Cooke
Referring Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Filing 7 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Janet Paterno (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit C)(Margulies, Jason)
August 3, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Janet Paterno. Celebrity Cruises Inc. waiver sent on 8/3/2020, answer due 10/2/2020. (Margulies, Jason)
July 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order of Referral and Order Regarding Court Practices and Procedures. Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 7/24/2020. See attached document for full details. (jbs)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Goodmans Discovery Procedures Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 7/24/2020. See attached document for full details. (vmz)
July 23, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Celebrity Cruises Inc. (jbs)
July 23, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jbs)
July 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Celebrity Cruises Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13228351, filed by Janet Paterno. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Margulies, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paterno v. Celebrity Cruises Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celebrity Cruises Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Paterno
Represented By: Daniel Wayne Grammes
Represented By: Andrew Scott Freedman
Represented By: Jason Robert Margulies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?