Hamblett v. Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Robin Hamblett
Defendant: Janssen Research & Development LLC, Ivax LLC, Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc., Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals, Inc,, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc., Baker Norton Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Global Respiratory Research, LLC, Alza Corporation, Bayer Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Ivax Corporation, Ivax Research LLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ivax Research Inc., Ivax Laboratories, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Research & Development,L.L.C. and Janssen Ortho LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv23144
Filed: July 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Ursula Ungaro
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Filing 34 Unopposed MOTION to Stay all Proceedings Pending a Decision on MDL Centralization and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Alza Corporation, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc.. Responses due by 10/9/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Motion to Transfer)(Walz, David)
September 24, 2020 Filing 33 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alza Corporation, Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals, Inc,, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Bayer AG, for Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals, Inc, (Walz, David)
September 24, 2020 Filing 32 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ivax LLC, Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. for Ivax LLC, Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc. (Gerber, Daniel)
September 24, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Supporting Memorandum by Ivax LLC, Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc.. Attorney Daniel Jay Gerber added to party Ivax LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel Jay Gerber added to party Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc.(pty:dft). Responses due by 10/8/2020 (Gerber, Daniel)
September 24, 2020 Filing 30 Clerks Notice to Filer re #29 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and to File Joint Planning and Scheduling Report . Motion with Multiple Reliefs Filed as One Relief; ERROR - The Filer selected only one relief event and failed to select the additional corresponding events for each relief requested in the motion. The docket entry was corrected by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future filings must comply with the instructions in the CM/ECF Attorney User's Manual. AND Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls)
September 24, 2020 Filing 29 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by Alza Corporation, Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals, Inc,, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc.. Attorney David J. Walz added to party Alza Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney David J. Walz added to party Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals, Inc,(pty:dft), Attorney David J. Walz added to party JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.(pty:dft), Attorney David J. Walz added to party Janssen Ortho LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David J. Walz added to party Janssen Research & Development LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David J. Walz added to party Johnson & Johnson (pty:dft), Attorney David J. Walz added to party Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc.(pty:dft). Responses due by 10/8/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Walz, David) Modified Relief on 9/24/2020 (ls). Added MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Planning and Scheduling Report on 9/24/2020 (ls).
September 23, 2020 Filing 28 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Robin Hamblett. Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals, Inc, served on 9/17/2020, answer due 10/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Widlanski, Benjamin)
September 23, 2020 Filing 27 Plaintiff's MOTION to Withdraw Document #26 Summons Returned Executed, by Robin Hamblett. Responses due by 10/7/2020 (Widlanski, Benjamin)
September 23, 2020 Filing 26 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Robin Hamblett. Robin Hamblett served on 9/17/2020, answer due 10/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Widlanski, Benjamin)
September 16, 2020 Filing 25 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Robin Hamblett. Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc. served on 9/8/2020, answer due 9/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Widlanski, Benjamin)
September 15, 2020 Filing 24 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Robin Hamblett. JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. served on 9/9/2020, answer due 9/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Widlanski, Benjamin)
September 15, 2020 Filing 23 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Robin Hamblett. Janssen Research & Development LLC served on 9/9/2020, answer due 9/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Widlanski, Benjamin)
September 15, 2020 Filing 22 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Robin Hamblett. Johnson & Johnson served on 9/9/2020, answer due 9/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Widlanski, Benjamin)
September 14, 2020 Filing 21 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Robin Hamblett. Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals, Inc, served on 9/3/2020, answer due 9/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Widlanski, Benjamin)
September 14, 2020 Filing 20 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Robin Hamblett. Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc. served on 9/3/2020, answer due 9/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Widlanski, Benjamin)
September 14, 2020 Filing 19 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Robin Hamblett. Janssen Ortho LLC served on 9/3/2020, answer due 9/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Widlanski, Benjamin)
September 14, 2020 Filing 18 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Robin Hamblett. Ivax LLC served on 9/3/2020, answer due 9/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Widlanski, Benjamin)
September 3, 2020 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc.. (kpe)
September 2, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Teva by Robin Hamblett (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Widlanski, Benjamin)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STANDING ORDER ON ZOOM AND OTHER VIDEO-CONFERENCE HEARINGS. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 7/30/2020. See attached document for full details. (drz)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PLANNING AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Joint Scheduling Report due by 9/25/2020 Scheduling Conference set for 10/9/2020 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 7/30/2020. See attached document for full details. (drz)
July 29, 2020 Filing 13 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons for Teva Global Respiratory Research, LLC cannot be issued. The party(ies) on the summons(es) does not match the initiating documents (drz)
July 29, 2020 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Janssen Research & Development LLC. (drz)
July 29, 2020 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc. (drz)
July 29, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Johnson & Johnson. (drz)
July 29, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (drz)
July 29, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Janssen Ortho LLC. (drz)
July 29, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Ivax LLC. (drz)
July 29, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals, Inc,. (drz)
July 29, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Alza Corporation. (drz)
July 29, 2020 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Alias Not Added. The Filer failed to add the alias information for the party(ies). The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (drz)
July 29, 2020 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (drz)
July 29, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (drz)
July 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13262535, filed by Robin Hamblett. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s), #5 Summon(s), #6 Summon(s), #7 Summon(s), #8 Summon(s), #9 Summon(s), #10 Summon(s))(Widlanski, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamblett v. Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Research & Development LLC
Represented By: David J. Walz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivax LLC
Represented By: Daniel Jay Gerber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Jay Gerber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals, Inc,
Represented By: David J. Walz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: David J. Walz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Represented By: David J. Walz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Represented By: David J. Walz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker Norton Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Jay Gerber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Global Respiratory Research, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Jay Gerber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alza Corporation
Represented By: David J. Walz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Represented By: David J. Walz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivax Corporation
Represented By: Daniel Jay Gerber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivax Research LLC
Represented By: Daniel Jay Gerber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: David J. Walz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: David J. Walz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivax Research Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Jay Gerber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivax Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Jay Gerber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Research & Development,L.L.C.
Represented By: David J. Walz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Ortho LLC
Represented By: David J. Walz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Hamblett
Represented By: Susan Stanfill Carlson
Represented By: Tal J Lifshitz
Represented By: Francisco Raul Maderal, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin Jacobs Widlanski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?