UBS Credit Corp. et al v. Esteva et al
Appellee: Denise Otero Vilarino and Lorenzo Esteva
Appellant: UBS Credit Corp. and UBS Financial Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv23183
Filed: July 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia G Cooke
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UBS Credit Corp., UBS Financial Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent UBS Group AG, Corporate Parent UBS Americas Holding LLC, Corporate Parent UBS Americas Inc. for UBS Credit Corp., UBS Financial Services, Inc. (Sabo, Alex)
September 28, 2020 Filing 8 Appellant's BRIEF by UBS Credit Corp., UBS Financial Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Volume 1(A), #2 Appendix Volume 1(B), #3 Appendix Volume 2(A), #4 Appendix Volume 2(B))(Sabo, Alex)
August 28, 2020 Filing 7 Bankruptcy Notice of Entry pursuant to Rule 8018 and NOTICE TO ATTORNEY - Pursuant to the Southern District of Florida Local Rules, and the Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure, the Appellant has 30 days after the docketing of the Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court to serve and file a brief. The Appellee shall serve and file a response brief within 30 days after service of Appellant's brief. The Appellant shall serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of the Appelle's brief. Appellant Brief due by 9/28/2020. (jc)
August 28, 2020 Filing 6 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 06/10/2020 before Judge Laurel M. Isicoff, 31 pages, Court Reporter: Oulette and Mauldin. Telephone number: (305) 358-8875. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/31/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/10/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/8/2020. (dcn)
August 28, 2020 Filing 5 Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by UBS Credit Corp., UBS Financial Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Appellant's Designation, #3 Appellee's Designation)(dcn)
July 31, 2020 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice to Parties Re Administrative Order 2015-9 and Amendments to Federal Bankruptcy Rules and Local Rule 87.4 Re Processing of Bankruptcy Appeals (jc)
July 31, 2020 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jc)
July 31, 2020 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Transmittal of re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by UBS Credit Corp., UBS Financial Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(dcn)
July 31, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT (received), Bankruptcy Court case number 19-1047-LMI, filed by UBS Credit Corp., UBS Financial Services, Inc..(dcn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UBS Credit Corp. et al v. Esteva et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Denise Otero Vilarino
Represented By: Gary Michael Murphree
Represented By: Daniel Foodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Lorenzo Esteva
Represented By: Gary Michael Murphree
Represented By: Daniel Foodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: UBS Credit Corp.
Represented By: Alex Joseph Sabo, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: UBS Financial Services, Inc.
Represented By: Alex Joseph Sabo, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?