Global Garlic, Inc. v. Distribuidora Mi Honduras, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Global Garlic, Inc.
Defendant: Distribuidora Mi Honduras, LLC and Omar Cerna Rubinstein
Case Number: 1:2020cv23423
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Referring Judge: Lauren Fleischer Louis
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE (Amended Pleadings due by 12/14/2020., Discovery due by 5/4/2021., Fact Discovery due by 5/4/2021., Expert Discovery due by 5/4/2021., Joinder of Parties due by 12/14/2020., Mediation Deadline 5/18/2021., In Limine Motions due by 5/26/2021., Dispositive Motions due by 5/26/2021., Motions due by 5/26/2021., Joint Pretrial Stipulation due by 8/16/2021., Jury Trial set for 8/30/2021 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom., Calendar Call set for 8/24/2021 01:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 5/18/2021.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 10/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (ebz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
October 8, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint , MOTION to Change Venue (to Dismiss due to Improper Venue) ( Responses due by 10/22/2020), MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ( Responses due by 10/22/2020) by Omar Cerna Rubinstein, Distribuidora Mi Honduras, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Translation from Spanish to English of the Parties' Respective Terms at Issue in the Complaint, #2 Exhibit Map of the Departments of Honduras, #3 Exhibit United Nation's Map of Honduras, #4 Exhibit Encyclopedia information about Olancho Department, #5 Exhibit Google Map Showing Jutiquile, #6 Affidavit of Omar Cerna Rubinstein with its Exhibit A incorporated therein)(Latham, Susan)
October 8, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Susan Joy Latham on behalf of Omar Cerna Rubinstein, Distribuidora Mi Honduras, LLC. Attorney Susan Joy Latham added to party Omar Cerna Rubinstein (pty:dft), Attorney Susan Joy Latham added to party Distribuidora Mi Honduras, LLC (pty:dft). (Latham, Susan)
September 17, 2020 Set/Reset Answer Due Deadline as per DE #8 : Omar Cerna Rubinstein response due 10/8/2020; Distribuidora Mi Honduras, LLC response due 10/8/2020. (lk)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER striking #7 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Defendant DMH's Deadline to obtain new counsel 10/8/2020. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 9/17/2020. See attached document for full details. (lk)
September 16, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction #1 Complaint by Omar Cerna Rubinstein, Distribuidora Mi Honduras, LLC. (Address Added) Responses due by 9/30/2020 (ebz)
September 10, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Global Garlic, Inc.. Distribuidora Mi Honduras, LLC served on 8/31/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. (Sanchelima, Christian)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Requiring Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 8/18/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (pcs)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Omar Cerna Rubinstein, Distribuidora Mi Honduras, LLC. (pcs)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13367921, filed by Global Garlic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2)(Sanchelima, Christian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Global Garlic, Inc. v. Distribuidora Mi Honduras, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Distribuidora Mi Honduras, LLC
Represented By: Susan Joy Latham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omar Cerna Rubinstein
Represented By: Susan Joy Latham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Global Garlic, Inc.
Represented By: Christian Jay Sanchelima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?