Lopez Macaya v. Miami Herald et al
Plaintiff: Yandri Lopez Macaya
Defendant: Miami Herald and David Goodhue
Case Number: 1:2020cv23424
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Lisette M Reid
Referring Judge: Ursula Ungaro
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid/ Case Closed by District Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 9/21/2020. (daa)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that the Complaint DE #1 is DISMISSED. This case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 9/18/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to the extent that the plaintiff need not prepay even a partial filing fee in this case, or to prepay costs such as for service of process. Plaintiff owes the United States a debt of $350.00 which must be paid to the Clerk of the Court as funds become available.USM Service NOT Ordered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 8/19/2020. See attached document for full details. (br)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE CIVIL RIGHTS LITIGANTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 8/19/2020. See attached document for full details. (br)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 Clerks Notice of Magistrate Judge Assignment to Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2 for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters., Per Chambers. (cds)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. (cds)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (With Inmate Account Statement) by Yandri Lopez Macaya. (cds)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. (cds)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against David Goodhue, Miami Herald. Filing fee $ 400.00. IFP Filed, filed by Yandri Lopez Macaya.(cds)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez Macaya v. Miami Herald et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yandri Lopez Macaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami Herald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Goodhue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?