Kettler v. MSC CRUISES S.A. CO. et al
Plaintiff: Cori Kettler
Defendant: MSC Cruises (USA) Inc., MSC CRUISES S.A. CO. and MSC Cruises S.A.
Case Number: 1:2020cv23425
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia G Cooke
Referring Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice ONLY as to Defendants MSC Cruises (USA), Inc. and MSC Cruises S.A. Co. by Cori Kettler (Freidin, Jonathan)
October 15, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION to Drop Party Defendants by Cori Kettler (Freidin, Jonathan)
October 15, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MSC Cruises S.A., MSC Cruises (USA) Inc., MSC CRUISES S.A. CO.. MSC Cruises S.A. waiver sent on 10/15/2020, answer due 12/14/2020; MSC CRUISES S.A. CO. waiver sent on 10/15/2020, answer due 12/14/2020. (Holman, Steve)
October 15, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Cori Kettler. MSC Cruises (USA) Inc. waiver sent on 10/15/2020, answer due 12/14/2020. (Freidin, Jonathan)
October 14, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against MSC CRUISES S.A. CO., MSC Cruises (USA) Inc., MSC Cruises S.A., filed by Cori Kettler.(Freidin, Jonathan)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ENDORSED ORDER Regarding Phone Calls to Chambers. The following rules apply in this and all other civil matters pending before Judge Marcia G. Cooke: 1. Do not call Chambers to ask about the status of pending motions, including motions for extension of time. The Court is aware of all pending motions and will address each of them in due course. 2. Do not call Chambers if the information you seek, or seek to provide, can be conveyed through a filing on the docket. 3. Do not call Chambers if the information you seek is available from other sources, including Court Orders and the Local Rules. 4. If you call Chambers for a permissible purpose, counsel for all affected parties must be on the line. Calls from non-attorneys and ex parte calls will not be accepted. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 8/19/2020. (kou)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 8/19/2020. See attached document for full details. (kou)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (yha)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke (yha)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MSC CRUISES S.A. CO., MSC Cruises (USA) Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13368285, filed by Cori Kettler. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s))(Freidin, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kettler v. MSC CRUISES S.A. CO. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MSC Cruises (USA) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MSC CRUISES S.A. CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MSC Cruises S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cori Kettler
Represented By: Thomas D Graham
Represented By: Jonathan Edward Freidin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?