Gary-Scott v. Carnival Corporation
Plaintiff: Rhonda Gary-Scott
Defendant: Carnival Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv23432
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Darrin P Gayles
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. Pursuant to S.D. Fla. Local Rule 16.1, on or before October 22, 2020, the parties shall prepare and file a Joint Scheduling Report, as well as Certificates of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statements.The parties shall also file a Proposed Scheduling Order, adhering to the format and guidance of the attached form. If the parties deviate in any way from that format and guidance, they shall contemporaneously submit a written explanation, which provides their purported justification for each and every deviation. If the parties fail to submit such written explanation, the Court may enter a Scheduling Order that does not take into account the parties' proposed dates.Failure to comply with this Order shall be grounds for dismissal without prejudice and without further notice. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles See attached document for full details. (hs01)
September 11, 2020 Filing 10 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Rhonda Gary-Scott (Turchin, Jason)
September 11, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of NO Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Rhonda Gary-Scott (Turchin, Jason)
September 11, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of Address by Whitney Page (Page, Whitney)
September 11, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Carnival Corporation. (Tejera, Valentina)
September 11, 2020 Filing 6 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Carnival Corporation (Tejera, Valentina)
September 11, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Valentina M. Tejera on behalf of Carnival Corporation. Attorney Valentina M. Tejera added to party Carnival Corporation(pty:dft). (Tejera, Valentina)
August 26, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Carnival Corporation. (kpe)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (kpe)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carnival Corporation. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13369578, filed by Rhonda Gary-Scott. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Turchin, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gary-Scott v. Carnival Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carnival Corporation
Represented By: Valentina M. Tejera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Gary-Scott
Represented By: Jason Scott Turchin
Represented By: Whitney Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?