Kerr v. BARR et al
Petitioner: Kwesi O. Kerr
Respondent: WILLIAM BARR, Chad Wolf, Liana J. Castano and Michael W. Meade
Case Number: 1:2020cv23441
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Referring Judge: Lisette M Reid
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Filing 25 SECOND Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail re #17 Order of Instructions to Pro Se Litigant, 16 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,. US Mail returned for: Kwesi O. Kerr. The Court has not located an updated address for this party. After two undeliverable notices from the Court, notices will no longer be sent to this party in this case until a correct address is provided. (pgz)
September 24, 2020 Filing 24 FIRST Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail re 23 Order Withdrawing Reference/Case No Longer Referred, 14 Order,, #20 Order Dismissing Case,. US Mail returned for: Kwesi O. Kerr. The Court has not located an updated address for this party. After two undeliverable notices from the Court, notices will no longer be sent to this party in this case until a correct address is provided. (pgz)
September 2, 2020 Filing 23 PAPERLESS Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid/Case Closed by the District Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 9/2/2020. (br)
August 31, 2020 Filing 22 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT. Case transferred from Florida Southern has been opened in Middle District of Florida as case 2:20-cv-00674, filed 08/31/2020. (jua)
August 28, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE by WILLIAM BARR, Liana J. Castano, Michael W. Meade, Chad Wolf re #20 Order Dismissing Case, of Service of Order on Petitioner at Glades County Detention Center (Weinkle, James)
August 28, 2020 SYSTEM ENTRY - Case 1:20-cv-23441 electronically transferred out to Florida Middle. (wc)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER that the Clerk is instructed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida and mark this case as CLOSED in this District. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/28/2020. See attached document for full details. (wc)
August 28, 2020 Filing 19 STATUS REPORT In Compliance with Second Paperless Order Requiring Status Report (ECF No. 14) by WILLIAM BARR, Liana J. Castano, Michael W. Meade, Chad Wolf (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "1" - EARM Report, #2 Exhibit "2" - FTC Letter)(Weinkle, James)
August 28, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Alan Weinkle on behalf of WILLIAM BARR, Liana J. Castano, Michael W. Meade, Chad Wolf. Attorney James Alan Weinkle added to party WILLIAM BARR(pty:res), Attorney James Alan Weinkle added to party Liana J. Castano(pty:res), Attorney James Alan Weinkle added to party Michael W. Meade(pty:res), Attorney James Alan Weinkle added to party Chad Wolf(pty:res). (Weinkle, James)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 INITIAL ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 8/25/2020. See attached document for full details. (daa)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Petitioner's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis has already been granted. See [ECF No. 15]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 8/26/2020. (rm01)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Granting to the extent that the plaintiff need not prepay even a partial filing fee in this case, or to prepay costs such as for service of process. USM Service NOT Ordered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 8/26/2020. (rm01)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SECOND PAPERLESS ORDER REQUIRING STATUS REPORT. The Court previously ordered the Respondent(s) to file a report regarding Petitioner's custody status [ECF No. 11]. However, at the time of the entry of the order, the case file was sealed. The Clerk has since unsealed the case file in part. [ECF Nos. 12, 13]. Accordingly, in an abundance of caution, the Court is reissuing the paperless order in [ECF No. 11] and requiring the Respondent(s) to file a response addressing Petitioner's custody status with supporting documentation by Friday, August 28, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 8/26/2020. (rm01)
August 26, 2020 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE of Compliance by Unsealing Case pursuant to #12 Order (nc)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF DIRECTIONS TO CLERK #3 Motion to File Habeas Corpus Under Seal and Anonymously, #7 Motion File Habeas Corpus Under Seal and Anonymously are GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, and #10 Motion to File Emergency Temporary Restraining Order Under Seal is DENIED without prejudice; and All other docket entries shall be UNSEALED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 8/26/2020. See attached document for full details. (nc)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER REQUIRING STATUS REPORT. By Friday, August 28, 2020, the Respondent shall file a status report with the Court addressing whether Petitioner remains in ICE detention. Supporting documentation shall be filed with the report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 8/25/2020. (rm01)
August 21, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION To File emergency Temporary Restraining Order ( Responses due by 9/4/2020), and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Anonymously and Under Seal by Kwesi O. Kerr. (dj)
August 21, 2020 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Persons by Kwesi O. Kerr (dj)
August 21, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kwesi O. Kerr. (dj)
August 21, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to File Habeas Corpus Under Seal and Anonymously by Kwesi O. Kerr. (dj)
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 Emergency Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Kwesi O. Kerr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(dj) Modified on 8/24/2020 (dj).
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis 28 USC 1915 by Kwesi O. Kerr, Petitioner. (nc)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS by Kwesi O. Kerr, Petitioner (nc)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to File Habeas Corpus Under Seal and Anonymously by Kwesi O. Kerr, Petitioner. (nc)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid (nc)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 EMERGENCY PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. Filing fee $ 5.00. IFP Filed, filed by Kwesi O. Kerr, Petitioner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(nc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kerr v. BARR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM BARR
Represented By: James Alan Weinkle
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad Wolf
Represented By: James Alan Weinkle
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Liana J. Castano
Represented By: James Alan Weinkle
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michael W. Meade
Represented By: James Alan Weinkle
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kwesi O. Kerr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?