Securities and Exchange Commission v. Coggins et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: David C. Coggins, Coral Gables Asset Management, LLC.,, Coral Gables Asset Holdings, L.P., and Coral Gables Capital, L.P.,
Case Number: 1:2020cv23444
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Edwin G Torres
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:0077
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Civil Case Terminated per DE 26 Order. Closing Case. (kpe)
September 24, 2020 Filing 27 JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANTS DAVID C. COGGINS AND CORAL GABLES ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC, AND RELIEF DEFENDANTS CORAL GABLES ASSET HOLDINGS, L.P., AND CORAL GABLES CAPITAL, L.P. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 9/24/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS MATTER is before the Court on Plaintiff's unopposed motion for entry of judgment as to Defendants David C. Coggins and Coral Gables Management LLC and Relief Defendants Coral Gables Asset Holdings, L.P. and Coral Gables Capital, L.P. #25 . Plaintiff indicates that all Defendants and Relief Defendants have consented to entry of the judgment attached to the motion, which will resolve this matter without the need for a trial. On review of the motion, proposed judgment, and record, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Plaintiff's motion #25 is GRANTED. A separate order of judgment will be entered. The Clerk is directed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 9/24/2020. (sgi)
September 23, 2020 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION for Judgment as to Defendants David C. Coggins and Coral Gables Asset Management LLC, and Relief Defendants Coral Gables Asset Holdings, L.P., and Coral Gables Capital, L.P. by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Signed Consent, #2 Exhibit B - Judgment, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Carlyle, Zachary)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #23 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. The Parties shall file their joint scheduling report and joint proposed scheduling order on or before September 23, 2020. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 9/17/2020. (sgi)
September 16, 2020 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time for the Parties to File a Joint Scheduling Conference Report and Joint Proposed Scheduling Report by Securities and Exchange Commission. Responses due by 9/30/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Martin, Christopher)
September 3, 2020 Filing 22 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by David C. Coggins (Sallah, James)
August 31, 2020 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Martin, Christopher)
August 28, 2020 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. David C. Coggins waiver sent on 8/28/2020, answer due 10/27/2020. (Martin, Christopher)
August 28, 2020 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Coral Gables Capital, L.P., waiver sent on 8/28/2020, answer due 10/27/2020. (Martin, Christopher)
August 28, 2020 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Coral Gables Asset Management, LLC., waiver sent on 8/28/2020, answer due 10/27/2020. (Martin, Christopher)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER. In light of the Court's order granting Plaintiff's unopposed motion for preliminary injunction #16 , the show cause hearing set for September 1, 2020 at 9:30 AM #9 is CANCELLED. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 8/27/2020. (sgi)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 PLAINTIFF SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSIONS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, ASSET FREEZE, AND OTHER RELIEF AGAINST DEFENDANTS DAVID C. COGGINS AND CORAL GABLES ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC, AND RELIEF DEFENDANTS CORAL GABLES ASSET HOLDINGS, L.P., AND CORAL GABLES CAPITAL, L.P. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 8/26/2020. See attached document for full details. (drz)
August 26, 2020 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Permanent Injunction by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Signed Consent, #2 Exhibit B - Preliminary Injunction Order, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Carlyle, Zachary)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636 and the Magistrate Rules of the Local Rules for the Southern District of Florida, all discovery disputes and non-dispositive pretrial motions are REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres. Additionally, it is further ORDERED that WITHIN TWENTY (20) DAYS from the date that the last defendant responds to the complaint, the Parties shall file a joint conference report and a joint proposed scheduling order, as required by S.D. Fla. Local Rule 16.1(b). Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 8/26/2020. See attached document for full details. (drz)
August 26, 2020 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE of Compliance by Lifting of The Seal pursuant to #12 Order (nc)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting #11 Motion to Lift the Seal and for the Court to Instruct the Clerk of Court to Place all previously filed Pleadings, Exhibits, and Order on the Publicly Accessible Docket. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 8/24/2020. See attached document for full details. (nc)
August 24, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Lift the Seal and for the Court to Instruct the Clerk of Court to Place all previously filed Pleadings, Exhibits, and Order on the Publicly Accessible Docket by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(mc)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting #5 Motion for Leave to File Its Emergency Ex Parte Motion and Memorandum of Law for Temporary Restraining Order, Asset Freeze, and Other Relief In Excess of The 20-Page Limit Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 8/19/2020. See attached document for full details. (nc)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting In Part #4 Emergency Ex Parte Motion and Memorandum of Law for Temporary Restraining Order, Asset Freeze, and Other Relief( Show Cause Hearing set for 9/1/2020 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Kathleen M. Williams.). Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 8/19/2020. See attached document for full details. (nc)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #3 Motion to File Under Seal Its Complaint, Emergency Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Asset Freeze, and Other Relief, and Other Documents. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 8/19/2020. See attached document for full details. (nc)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to David C. Coggins, Coral Gables Asset Holdings, L.P.,, Coral Gables Asset Management, LLC.,, Coral Gables Capital, L.P.,. (nc)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATION PURSUANT to Rule 65(b) of The Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by Securities and Exchange Commission (nc)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to File Its Emergency Ex Parte Motion and Memorandum of Law for Temporary Restraining Order, Asset Freeze, and Other Relief In Excess of The 20-Page Limit by Securities and Exchange Commission.( Responses due by 9/2/2020), (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(nc)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 EMERGENCY EX PARTE MOTION and Memorandum of Law for Temporary Restraining Order, Asset Freeze, and Other Relief by Securities and Exchange Commission.( Responses due by 9/2/2020), (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (nc). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/19/2020: #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit) (nc).
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to File Under Seal Its Complaint, Emergency Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Asset Freeze, and Other Relief, and Other Documents by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(nc)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams and Magistrate Edwin G. Torres (nc)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE AND OTHER RELIEF JURY TRIAL DEMANDED against David C. Coggins, Coral Gables Asset Holdings, L.P.,, Coral Gables Asset Management, LLC.,, Coral Gables Capital, L.P.,. Filing fees $ 400.00. USA Filer - No Filing Fee Required, filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Coggins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David C. Coggins
Represented By: James D. Sallah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coral Gables Asset Management, LLC.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coral Gables Asset Holdings, L.P.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coral Gables Capital, L.P.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Zachary T. Carlyle
Represented By: Christopher E. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?