Rodriguez et al v. Supersonic of Florida, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Eyeris Rodriguez, Yordany Martinez, Eliser Rodriguez, Edel Valdes Milian, Hector Gutierrez, Alfredo Gonzalez, Vladimir Sanchez Rivero, Omar Boedo, Hanoy Capdevila and Alain Lopez
Defendant: Amed Carretero, Supersonic of Florida, Inc. and Juan C. Gonzalez
Case Number: 1:2020cv23459
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Robert N Scola
Referring Judge: Edwin G Torres
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:0201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of Upcoming Deadline to Serve under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m). Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 9/21/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds)
September 18, 2020 Filing 9 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Alfredo Gonzalez, Hector Gutierrez, Yordany Martinez, Omar Boedo, Vladimir Sanchez Rivero, Eliser Rodriguez, Eyeris Rodriguez, Hanoy Capdevila, Alain Lopez, Edel Valdes Milian.(Sanchez, Anthony)
September 9, 2020 Filing 8 Statement of: Plaintiffs' Preliminary Statement of Claim by Eyeris Rodriguez re #5 Order of Requirements,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, (Sanchez, Anthony)
August 26, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Anthony Sanchez on behalf of Alfredo Gonzalez, Eliser Rodriguez. Attorney Anthony Sanchez added to party Alfredo Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Sanchez added to party Eliser Rodriguez(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join - Alfredo Gonzalez, #2 Exhibit Consent to Join - Eliser Valencia Rodriguez) (Sanchez, Anthony)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 8/24/2020. See attached document for full details. (mdc)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference, Order Requiring Statement of Claim and Response in FLSA Case, and Order Referring Discovery Matters to the Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 8/20/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Anthony Sanchez on behalf of Yordany Martinez, Eyeris Rodriguez, Edel Valdes Milian, Hanoy Capdevila, Omar Boedo, Vladimir Sanchez Rivero, Alain Lopez, Hector Gutierrez. Attorney Anthony Sanchez added to party Edel Valdes Milian(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Sanchez added to party Hanoy Capdevila(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Sanchez added to party Omar Boedo(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Sanchez added to party Vladimir Sanchez Rivero(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Sanchez added to party Alain Lopez(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Sanchez added to party Hector Gutierrez(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join - Eyeris Rodriguez, #2 Exhibit Consent to Join - Yordany Martinez, #3 Exhibit Consent to Join - Edel Valdes Milian, #4 Exhibit Consent to Join - Hanoy Capdevila, #5 Exhibit Consent to Join - Omar Boedo, #6 Exhibit Consent to Join - Vladimir Sanchez Rivero, #7 Exhibit Consent to Join - Alain Lopez, #8 Exhibit Consent to Join - Hector Gutierrez) (Sanchez, Anthony)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Amed Carretero, Juan C. Gonzalez, Supersonic of Florida, Inc.. (cds)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13377435, filed by Eyeris Rodriguez, Yordany Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Proposed Summons - Supersonic of Florida, Inc., #3 Summon(s) Proposed Summons - Juan C. Gonzalez, #4 Summon(s) Summons - Amed Carretero)(Sanchez, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez et al v. Supersonic of Florida, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eyeris Rodriguez
Represented By: Anthony Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yordany Martinez
Represented By: Anthony Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eliser Rodriguez
Represented By: Anthony Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edel Valdes Milian
Represented By: Anthony Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector Gutierrez
Represented By: Anthony Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfredo Gonzalez
Represented By: Anthony Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vladimir Sanchez Rivero
Represented By: Anthony Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omar Boedo
Represented By: Anthony Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hanoy Capdevila
Represented By: Anthony Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alain Lopez
Represented By: Anthony Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amed Carretero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Supersonic of Florida, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan C. Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?