Limansky, et al v. Laboratory Corporation of America
Plaintiff: Luisa Limansky and Arnaldo Limansky
Defendant: Laboratory Corporation of America
Case Number: 1:2020cv23460
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Darrin P Gayles
Referring Judge: Alicia M Otazo-Reyes
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MOTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: (Jury Trial set for 11/8/2021 before Judge Darrin P. Gayles., Calendar Call set for 11/3/2021 09:30 AM before Judge Darrin P. Gayles., Status Conference set for 8/18/2021 before Judge Darrin P. Gayles. ), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 9/16/2020. See attached document for full details. (pcs) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
September 15, 2020 Filing 17 Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Laboratory Corporation of America. (Hearn, Robert)
September 9, 2020 Filing 16 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Laboratory Corporation of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hearn, Robert)
September 4, 2020 Filing 15 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Arnaldo Limansky, Luisa Limansky as per DE #14 (lk)
September 4, 2020 Filing 14 Plaintiff's AMENDED COMPLAINT against Laboratory Corporation of America, filed by Luisa Limansky, Arnaldo Limansky.(Gold, Philip)
September 4, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH DEFENDANTS WRITTEN CONSENT by Arnaldo Limansky, Luisa Limansky (Gold, Philip) Modified text on 9/8/2020 (lk).
August 28, 2020 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has not updated address and/or email information for attorney Philip Gold re #11 Notice of Change of Address. Attorney has not followed the required procedures for updating their information with the Court. Attorney is instructed to go to their PACER account, Manage My Account, to complete the process of updating their information. The Court is NOT responsible for updating secondary email addresses. See the Courts website for detailed instructions. #www.flsd.uscourts.gov/updating-your-information (cw)
August 28, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Change of Address by Philip Gold (Gold, Philip)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Enlarge Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant shall file its response to Plaintiffs' Complaint on or before September 4, 2020. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (jsi)
August 27, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Laboratory Corporation of America (Hearn, Robert)
August 26, 2020 Filing 8 Clerks Notice to Filer re #7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time file Response to Pltf's Complaint re #3 Notice (Other),. Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls)
August 26, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), #3 Amended Notice of Removal (as to Exhibit C only) by Laboratory Corporation of America. Responses due by 9/9/2020 (Hearn, Robert) Modified Relief on 8/26/2020 (ls).
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. Pursuant to S.D. Fla. Local Rule 16.1, on or before September 9, 2020, the parties shall prepare and file a Joint Scheduling Report, as well as Certificates of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statements.The parties shall also file a Proposed Scheduling Order, adhering to the format and guidance of the attached form. If the parties deviate in any way from that format and guidance, they shall contemporaneously submit a written explanation, which provides their purported justification for each and every deviation. If the parties fail to submit such written explanation, the Court may enter a Scheduling Order that does not take into account the parties' proposed dates.Failure to comply with this Order shall be grounds for dismissal without prejudice and without further notice. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (jsi)
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (jsi)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Leilani S. King, mailing date 08/20/2020, (cco)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of filing an amended Exhibit C by Laboratory Corporation of America re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), AMENDED (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Hearn, Robert) Modified text on 8/21/2020 (lk).
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jbs)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13377563, filed by Laboratory Corporation of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Hearn, Robert)(Motion to Dismiss Filed) Modified text on 8/20/2020 (jbs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Limansky, et al v. Laboratory Corporation of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laboratory Corporation of America
Represented By: Robert R. Hearn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luisa Limansky
Represented By: Philip Gold
Represented By: Leilani S. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arnaldo Limansky
Represented By: Philip Gold
Represented By: Leilani S. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?