Henry v. The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Kevin Henry
Defendant: The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv23461
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Ursula Ungaro
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company re #9 SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f)/16.1 of Filing Proposed Order (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Furman, Wendy)
October 16, 2020 Filing 9 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company (Furman, Wendy)
September 11, 2020 Filing 8 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Lincoln National Corporation for The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company (Furman, Wendy)
September 10, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. Attorney Wendy Lynn Furman added to party The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company(pty:dft). (Furman, Wendy)
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Kevin Henry. The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company served on 8/24/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dabdoub, Edward)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER ON ZOOM AND OTHER VIDEO -CONFERENCE HEARINGS. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 8/20/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PLANNING AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, ( Joint Planning and Scheduling Report due by 10/16/2020, Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference set for 10/30/2020 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro.) Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 8/20/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (amb)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DISABILITY AND EXTENSION OF DEATH BENEFITS against The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13377565, filed by Kevin Henry. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Dabdoub, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henry v. The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Wendy Lynn Furman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Henry
Represented By: Edward Philip Dabdoub
Represented By: Geannina Andrea Burgos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?