A & S Entertainment, LLC v. CLUB PINK PUSSY CAT, INC
Plaintiff: A & S Entertainment, LLC
Defendant: CLUB PINK PUSSY CAT, INC
Case Number: 1:2020cv23496
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that on or before November 19, 2020, Plaintiff shall perfect service upon the Defendant or show cause why this action should not be dismissed for failure to perfect service of process. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/11/2020. See attached document for full details. (wc)
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK. (scn)
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to CLUB PINK PUSSY CAT, INC. (scn)
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. (scn)
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (scn)
August 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CLUB PINK PUSSY CAT, INC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13391991, filed by A & S Entertainment, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Exhibit)(Ruz, Ricardo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A & S Entertainment, LLC v. CLUB PINK PUSSY CAT, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLUB PINK PUSSY CAT, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A & S Entertainment, LLC
Represented By: Ricardo Ruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?