Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 75.46.164.72
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 75.46.164.72
Case Number: 1:2020cv23559
Filed: August 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Robert N Scola
Referring Judge: Edwin G Torres
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 10/6/2020. See attached document for full details. (mdc)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER/Notice of Upcoming Deadline - 11/24/2020 -to Serveunder Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m) re #1 Complaint, filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 9/29/2020. See attached document for full details. (lk)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING #6 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Motions referred to Judge Edwin G. Torres. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 9/24/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds)
September 22, 2020 Filing 6 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Walker, Rachel)
August 31, 2020 Filing 5 Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent GENERAL MEDIA SYSTEMS, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Walker, Rachel)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference and Order Referring Discovery Matters to the Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 8/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds)
August 26, 2020 Filing 3 FORM AO 121 and Complaint Mailed TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE (cds)
August 26, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
August 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - ACTION FOR DAMAGES FOR PROPERTY RIGHTS INFRINGEMENT against JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 75.46.164.72. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13416476, filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to the Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Walker, Rachel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 75.46.164.72
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Rachel Elizabeth Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 75.46.164.72
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?