Martinez v. Celebrity Cruises Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Seida Martinez
Defendant: Celebrity Cruises Inc. and Cayman Sea Adventures Ltd doing business as Marineland Tours
Case Number: 1:2020cv23585
Filed: August 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Edwin G Torres
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Seida Martinez. Celebrity Cruises Inc. waiver sent on 9/28/2020, answer due 11/27/2020. (Holzberg, Glenn)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 9/1/2020. See attached document for full details. (yha)
August 31, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Cayman Sea Adventures Ltd, Celebrity Cruises Inc. (pes)
August 28, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Seida Martinez re 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case, Summons(es) (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Celebrity Cruises Inc., #2 Summon(s) Cayman Sea Adventures Ltd) (Holzberg, Glenn)
August 27, 2020 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. Attorney or Pro Se party's return address is not listed (cds)
August 27, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
August 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13425785, filed by Seida Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Celebrity Cruises Inc, #3 Summon(s) Cayman Sea Adventures Ltd)(Holzberg, Glenn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. Celebrity Cruises Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celebrity Cruises Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cayman Sea Adventures Ltd doing business as Marineland Tours
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seida Martinez
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Represented By: Louis Maxwell Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?