Carrot Love LLC v. Aspen Specialty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Carrot Love LLC d/b/a Carrot Express and Carrot Love, LLC doing business as Carrot Express
Defendant: Aspen Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv23586
Filed: August 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Robert N Scola
Referring Judge: Edwin G Torres
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER: denying as moot the Defendant's motion to dismiss. #8 . The filing of the Plaintiff's amended complaint #17 moots the motion to dismiss the prior pleading. See Taylor v. Alabama, 275 F. App'x 836, 838 (11th Cir. 2008) (noting that when the plaintiffs amended their complaint the defendants' motion to dismiss became moot). Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr (sda)
October 20, 2020 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Aspen Specialty Insurance Company filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by Carrot Love, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Amended Complaint)(Feldman, Adam) Modified Text on 10/21/2020 (ls).
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER: granting the Plaintiff's unopposed motion to file an amended complaint. #15 . The Plaintiff is ordered to file its amended complaint by October 20, 2020. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (sda)
October 12, 2020 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Carrot Love, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Motion for Leave, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion for Leave)(Feldman, Adam)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 10/6/2020. See attached document for full details. (mdc)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Jury Trial set for 9/27/2021 in Miami Division before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr.., Calendar Call set for 9/21/2021 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr..), and ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 10/2/2020. See attached document for full details. (ls) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
October 2, 2020 Filing 12 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Aspen Specialty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order)(Swindoll, Alan)
October 1, 2020 Reset Deadlines as to #8 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Responses due by 10/12/2020 (ls)(per DE #11)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER: granting the Plaintiff's unopposed motion for extension of time to respond to the Defendant's motion to dismiss. #10 . The Response is now due October 12, 2020. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (sda)
October 1, 2020 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or Amend Complaint re #8 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Carrot Love, LLC. Responses due by 10/15/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order on Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time)(Feldman, Adam)
September 21, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Aspen Specialty Insurance Company (Swindoll, Alan)
September 17, 2020 Filing 8 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Aspen Specialty Insurance Company. Responses due by 10/1/2020 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Berk Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Swindoll, Alan)
August 31, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam S. Feldman on behalf of Carrot Love, LLC. Attorney Adam S. Feldman added to party Carrot Love, LLC(pty:pla). (Feldman, Adam)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference and ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 8/28/2020. See attached document for full details. (ls)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PAPERLESS ORDER: granting the Aspen Specialty Insurance Company's motion to appear Pro Hac Vice. #4 . Attorney Yvette Ostolaza is given permission to appear and participate in this matter on behalf of Aspen Specialty Insurance Company. The Clerk is directed to provide this attorney with notification of all electronic filings via the email address set forth in the motion. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (sda)
August 28, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Yvette Ostolaza. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13430991 by Aspen Specialty Insurance Company. Responses due by 9/11/2020 (Swindoll, Alan)
August 28, 2020 Filing 3 Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aspen Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Aspen U.S. Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Aspen Insurance Holdings Limited, a Bermuda corporation, Corporate Parent Aspen (UK) Holdings Limited, Corporate Parent Aspen American Insurance Company for Aspen Specialty Insurance Company (Swindoll, Alan)
August 27, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jbs)
August 27, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Plaintiff's Complaint For Declaratory Relief) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13426222, filed by Aspen Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(Swindoll, Alan)(No Answer/Motion to Dismiss Filed) Modified text on 8/28/2020 (jbs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carrot Love LLC v. Aspen Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrot Love LLC d/b/a Carrot Express
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrot Love, LLC doing business as Carrot Express
Represented By: Candise Lynn Shanbron
Represented By: Adam S. Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aspen Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Alan Henry Swindoll
Represented By: Yvette Ostolaza
Represented By: William S. Berk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?