Airline Professionals Association of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Local Union No. 1224 et al v. Robert A. Angueira.
Appellant: Assoc. of Flight Attendants-CWA, AFL-CIO, International Brotherhood of Teamsters-Airline Division and Airline Professionals Association of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Local Union No. 1224
Appellee: Miami Air International, Inc. and Robert A. Angueira
Case Number: 1:2020cv23600
Filed: August 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Darrin P Gayles
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2020 Filing 16 Bankruptcy Notice of Entry pursuant to Rule 8018 and NOTICE TO ATTORNEY - Pursuant to the Southern District of Florida Local Rules, and the Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure, the Appellant has 30 days after the docketing of the Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court to serve and file a brief. The Appellee shall serve and file a response brief within 30 days after service of Appellant's brief. The Appellant shall serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of the Appelle's brief. Appellant Brief due by 11/23/2020. (jc)
October 22, 2020 Filing 15 Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, filed by Airline Professionals Association of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Local Union No. 1224, International Brotherhood of Teamsters-Airline Division, Assoc. of Flight Attendants-CWA, AFL-CIO (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Appellant's Designation, #3 Appellee's Designation)(dcn)
October 14, 2020 Filing 14 BANKRUPTCY ORDER Reinstating Bankruptcy Appeal and Granting [Bankruptcy Court ECF No. 625] Motion For Extension of Time to File Designation of Items to be Included in Record on Appeal and Statement of Issues to be Presented on Appeal Signed by US Bankruptcy Judge A. Jay Cristol on 10/12/2020. See attached document for full details. (jc)
October 14, 2020 Case Reopened Pursuant to ECF No. #14 Order. (jc)
September 29, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Reconsideration re #11 Bankruptcy Order Dismissing Bankruptcy Appeal, by Airline Professionals Association of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Local Union No. 1224, Assoc. of Flight Attendants-CWA, AFL-CIO, International Brotherhood of Teamsters-Airline Division. (Braswell, D.)
September 17, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE by Airline Professionals Association of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Local Union No. 1224, Assoc. of Flight Attendants-CWA, AFL-CIO, International Brotherhood of Teamsters-Airline Division re #11 Bankruptcy Order Dismissing Bankruptcy Appeal, of Filing Motion for Reconsideration of Order of Dismissal (Braswell, D.)
September 15, 2020 Filing 11 Bankruptcy Order Dismissing Bankruptcy Appeal for Failure by Appellant(s) to Timely File Designation or Statement of Issues, Closing Case. Signed by US Bankruptcy Judge A. Jay Cristol on 9/15/2020. See attached document for full details. (jc)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. John J. Grunert is permitted to appear before this Court on behalf of the Association of Flight Attendants-CWA, AFL-CIO, for all purposes relating to this action. The clerk is directed to provide Notice of Electronic Filings to Mr. Grunert at jgrunert@geclaw.com. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Jeffrey A. Bartos is permitted to appear before this Court on behalf of the Association of Flight Attendants-CWA, AFL-CIO, for all purposes relating to this action. The clerk is directed to provide Notice of Electronic Filings to Mr. Bartos at jbartos@geclaw.com. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01)
September 10, 2020 Filing 8 Statement of: APPELLANTS DESINATION OF ITEMS TO BE INCLUDED IN RECORD ON APPEAL AND STATEMENT OF ISSUES TO BE PRESENTED ON APPEAL by Airline Professionals Association of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Local Union No. 1224, Assoc. of Flight Attendants-CWA, AFL-CIO, International Brotherhood of Teamsters-Airline Division (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Braswell, D.)
September 10, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Yanay Galban on behalf of Miami Air International, Inc.. Attorney Yanay Galban added to party Miami Air International, Inc.(pty:e). (Galban, Yanay)
September 8, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for John J. Grunert. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13486510 by Assoc. of Flight Attendants-CWA, AFL-CIO. Responses due by 9/22/2020 (Attachments: #1 Appendix Certification in accord with Rule 4(b))(Braswell, D.)
September 8, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jeffrey A. Bartos. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13486429 by Assoc. of Flight Attendants-CWA, AFL-CIO. Responses due by 9/22/2020 (Attachments: #1 Appendix Certification in accord with Rule 4(b))(Braswell, D.)
August 28, 2020 Filing 4 New Bankruptcy Appeal Case Filed - Clerk's Notice to Parties Re Administrative Order 2015-9 and Amendments to Federal Bankruptcy Rules and Local Rule 87.4 Re Processing of Bankruptcy Appeals (jc)
August 28, 2020 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jc)
August 28, 2020 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Transmittal of re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, filed by Airline Professionals Association of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Local Union No. 1224, International Brotherhood of Teamsters-Airline Division, Assoc. of Flight Attendants-CWA, AFL-CIO (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(dcn)
August 28, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT (received), Bankruptcy Court case number 20-13924-AJC, filed by Airline Professionals Association of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Local Union No. 1224, International Brotherhood of Teamsters-Airline Division, Assoc. of Flight Attendants-CWA, AFL-CIO.(dcn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Airline Professionals Association of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Local Union No. 1224 et al v. Robert A. Angueira.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Assoc. of Flight Attendants-CWA, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Bartos
Represented By: D. Marcus Braswell, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Grunert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: International Brotherhood of Teamsters-Airline Division
Represented By: Edward M. Gleason, Jr.
Represented By: D. Marcus Braswell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Airline Professionals Association of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Local Union No. 1224
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Bartos
Represented By: D. Marcus Braswell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Miami Air International, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Joseph Battista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Robert A. Angueira
Represented By: Yanay Galban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?