Myeress v. Miami Tours, L.L.C.
Plaintiff: Joe Myeress
Defendant: Miami Tours, L.L.C. doing business as Miami Tours & Transport
Case Number: 1:2020cv23682
Filed: September 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Darrin P Gayles
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER administratively closing case in light of #12 the parties' Notice of Settlement, which indicates that this matter has settled in full. The parties are hereby notified that, within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, they must file a Stipulation or Notice of Dismissal and/or Settlement Agreement along with any other pertinent document necessary to conclude this action. Any pending motions are denied as moot. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01)
October 23, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Settlement by Joe Myeress (Teitelbaum, Meir)
October 20, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joe Myeress re #8 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Miami Tours, L.L.C., 10 Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other,, #9 Clerks Entry/Non-Entry of Default (Wirth, Craig)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE ON DEFAULT PROCEDURE. On October 5, 2020, a Clerk's Default was entered against Defendant #9 . Accordingly, on or before October 26, 2020, Plaintiff shall file a motion for final default judgment, accompanied by a proposed final default judgment attached to the motion as Exhibit A, and duly supported by affidavits and other documentation. Plaintiffs failure to file a Motion for Final Default Judgment on or before the date set forth above may result in dismissal of the instant action. Plaintiff shall immediately provide Defendant with a copy of this Order via certified mail. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01)
October 5, 2020 Filing 9 Clerks Entry of Default as to Miami Tours, L.L.C. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 10/5/2020. (kpe)
October 5, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Miami Tours, L.L.C. by Joe Myeress. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Attorney Craig Wirth, #2 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Service, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Wirth, Craig)
September 4, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Joe Myeress. Miami Tours, L.L.C. served on 9/3/2020, answer due 9/24/2020. (Rothman, Joel)
September 4, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01)
September 3, 2020 Filing 5 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Joe Myeress (Rothman, Joel)
September 3, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Miami Tours, L.L.C.. (kpe)
September 3, 2020 Filing 3 FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE (kpe)
September 3, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (kpe)
September 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement (Injunctive Relief Demanded) against Miami Tours, L.L.C.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13462446, filed by Joe Myeress. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Registration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Infringement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Demand Letters, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summon(s))(Rothman, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Myeress v. Miami Tours, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami Tours, L.L.C. doing business as Miami Tours & Transport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Myeress
Represented By: Joel Benjamin Rothman
Represented By: Meir Teitelbaum
Represented By: Craig Anthony Wirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?