Aegis Syndicate 1225 at Lloyds of London v. FedEx Supply Chain Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Aegis Syndicate 1225 at Lloyds of London a/s/o New England Technology [NETi] and Aegis Syndicate 1225 at Lloyds of London
Defendant: Transcargo Solutions Logistics Corp. and FedEx Supply Chain Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv23722
Filed: September 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William P Dimitrouleas
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Aegis Syndicate 1225 at Lloyds of London. FedEx Supply Chain Services, Inc. served on 10/21/2020, answer due 11/12/2020. (Tomaselli, John)
October 6, 2020 Filing 11 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Transcargo Solutions Logistics Corp. (Becerra, Robert)
September 30, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Transcargo Solutions Logistics Corp.. (Becerra, Robert)
September 24, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert John Becerra on behalf of Transcargo Solutions Logistics Corp.. Attorney Robert John Becerra added to party Transcargo Solutions Logistics Corp.(pty:dft). (Becerra, Robert)
September 22, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Aegis Syndicate 1225 at Lloyds of London. Transcargo Solutions Logistics Corp. served on 9/9/2020, answer due 9/30/2020. (Tomaselli, John)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney James P. Krauzlis. Local counsel must be ready to adequately represent the party at any time, including conducting the actual trial. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 9/11/2020. (mkz)
September 10, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for James Krauzlis. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13498220 by Aegis Syndicate 1225 at Lloyds of London. Responses due by 9/24/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certification of James Krauzlis, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Tomaselli, John)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Requiring Counsel To Meet, File Joint Scheduling Report And Joint Discovery Report. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 9/10/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
September 8, 2020 Filing 4 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Aegis Syndicate 1225 at Lloyds of London (Tomaselli, John)
September 8, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to FedEx Supply Chain Services, Inc., Transcargo Solutions Logistics Corp.. (kpe)
September 7, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (kpe)
September 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13476185, filed by Aegis Syndicate 1225 at Lloyds of London a/s/o New England Technology [NETi]. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s))(Tomaselli, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aegis Syndicate 1225 at Lloyds of London v. FedEx Supply Chain Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transcargo Solutions Logistics Corp.
Represented By: Robert John Becerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FedEx Supply Chain Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aegis Syndicate 1225 at Lloyds of London a/s/o New England Technology [NETi]
Represented By: John Joseph Tomaselli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aegis Syndicate 1225 at Lloyds of London
Represented By: John Joseph Tomaselli
Represented By: James P. Krauzlis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?