Lopez v. LVNV Funding, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Guerty Lopez
Defendant: LVNV Funding, LLC and Trueaccord Corp.
Case Number: 1:2020cv23861
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #10 Transmittal Letter Sent (amb)
September 22, 2020 Filing 10 Transmittal Letter Sent with Docket Sheet and Order to: 11th Judicial Circuit in and for Miami Dade County. State Court Case Number: 20-005090-CC-25 (amb)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF REMAND. ORDER granting #8 Motion to Remand to State Court. The Clerk is instructed to mark this case closed, and any pending motions are denied as moot. Motions Terminated: #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court (unopposed) filed by Guerty Lopez. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/22/2020. See attached document for full details. (amb)
September 22, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court (unopposed) by Guerty Lopez. (Baldwin, Bruce)
September 21, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against LVNV Funding, LLC, Trueaccord Corp., filed by Guerty Lopez.(Baldwin, Bruce)
September 21, 2020 Filing 6 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by LVNV Funding, LLC, Trueaccord Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Sherman Originator, LLC, Other Affiliate Resurgent Capital Services L.P. for LVNV Funding, LLC; Corporate Parent One True Holding Company for Trueaccord Corp. (Marees, John)
September 21, 2020 Filing 5 STATUS REPORT by LVNV Funding, LLC, Trueaccord Corp. (Marees, John)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties due by 9/29/2020. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/18/2020. See attached document for full details. (wc)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. Removal Status Report due by 9/29/2020. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/18/2020. See attached document for full details. (wc)
September 18, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
September 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13547627, filed by Trueaccord Corp., LVNV Funding, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit Return of Service and Summons)(Marees, John) (No Answer or Motion to Dismiss filed) Text Modified on 9/18/2020 (amb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. LVNV Funding, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LVNV Funding, LLC
Represented By: John Michael Marees, II
Represented By: Lauren Marshall Burnette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trueaccord Corp.
Represented By: John Michael Marees, II
Represented By: Lauren Marshall Burnette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guerty Lopez
Represented By: Bruce Benjamin Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?