Dweck v. City of Miami Springs et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Dweck
Defendant: City of Miami Springs and Florida State Lodge Fraternal Order of Police, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv23945
Filed: September 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Darrin P Gayles
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 0001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 PAPERLESS ORDER. As stated during the Telephonic Status Conference on November 4, 2020, Defendants shall file a response to Plaintiff's #17 Amended Petition to Compel Arbitration on or before December 9, 2020.Additionally, the parties shall attend a Telephonic Status Conference on December 9, 2020, at 10:00 A.M. before Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Counsel shall enter their appearances telephonically using the following dial-in information: Dial-in Number 888-273-3658; Access Code 7032614; Security Code 5170. Please dial in at least ten minutes before the Telephonic Status Conference begins and wait until your case is called. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (jsi)
November 4, 2020 Filing 23 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Darrin P. Gayles: Telephonic Status Conference held on November 4, 2020. Attorney Appearances: Jonathan Howard Railey, Sebastian Ohanian, and Paul A. Daragjati. Court Reporter: Patricia Diaz, 305-523-5178 / Patricia_Diaz@flsd.uscourts.gov. (jsi)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PAPERLESS ORDER setting Telephonic Pretrial Conference for November 4, 2020, at 10:00 A.M. before Judge Darrin P. Gayles regarding #18 Motion to Establish Summary Proceeding Protocol and to Set Scheduling Hearing.Counsel shall enter their appearances telephonically using the following dial-in information: Dial-in Number 888-273-3658; Access Code 7032614; Security Code 5170. Please dial in at least ten minutes before the Telephonic Pretrial Conference begins and wait until your case is called. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (jsi)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #14 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Petition to Compel Arbitration with Prejudice in light of Plaintiff's #17 Amended Petition to Compel Arbitration. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (jsi)
October 29, 2020 Filing 20 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by City of Miami Springs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Scheduling Order, #2 Exhibit Election to Jurisdiction Form)(Railey, Jonathan)
October 29, 2020 Filing 19 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by City of Miami Springs (Stearns, Christopher)
October 28, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Establish Summary Proceeding Procedure by Christopher Dweck. (Ohanian, Sebastian)
October 22, 2020 Filing 17 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against City of Miami Springs and Florida State Lodge Fraternal Order of Police, Inc. filed by Christopher Dweck.(Ohanian, Sebastian) Modified text on 10/22/2020 (jao).
October 15, 2020 Filing 16 Notice of Supplemental Authority re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Petition (Complaint) to Enforce/Compel Arbitration MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Petition (Complaint) to Enforce/Compel Arbitration FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by City of Miami Springs, Florida State Lodge Fraternal Order of Police, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Railey, Jonathan)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PPAPERLESS ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. Pursuant to S.D. Fla. Local Rule 16.1, on or before October 29, 2020, the parties shall prepare and file a Joint Scheduling Report, as well as Certificates of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statements.The parties shall also file a Proposed Scheduling Order, adhering to the format and guidance of the attached form. If the parties deviate in any way from that format and guidance, they shall contemporaneously submit a written explanation, which provides their purported justification for each and every deviation. If the parties fail to submit such written explanation, the Court may enter a Scheduling Order that does not take into account the parties' proposed dates.Failure to comply with this Order shall be grounds for dismissal without prejudice and without further notice. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (jsi)
October 8, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Petition (Complaint) to Enforce/Compel Arbitration , MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Petition (Complaint) to Enforce/Compel Arbitration FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ( Responses due by 10/22/2020) by City of Miami Springs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Railey, Jonathan)
October 6, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul A. Daragjati on behalf of Florida State Lodge Fraternal Order of Police, Inc.. Attorney Paul A. Daragjati added to party Florida State Lodge Fraternal Order of Police, Inc.(pty:dft). (Daragjati, Paul)
October 6, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Howard Railey on behalf of City of Miami Springs. Attorney Jonathan Howard Railey added to party City of Miami Springs(pty:dft). (Railey, Jonathan)
October 6, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher J. Stearns, Jr on behalf of City of Miami Springs. Attorney Christopher J. Stearns, Jr added to party City of Miami Springs(pty:dft). (Stearns, Christopher)
September 30, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (jsi)
September 30, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to City of Miami Springs. (pes)
September 30, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Florida State Lodge Fraternal Order of Police, Inc. (pes)
September 29, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Miami Springs by Christopher Dweck (Ohanian, Sebastian)
September 29, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) FOP by Christopher Dweck (Ohanian, Sebastian)
September 29, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Christopher Dweck (Ohanian, Sebastian)
September 29, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Christopher Dweck re 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case Civil Cover Sheet (Ohanian, Sebastian)
September 29, 2020 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (yha)
September 28, 2020 Filing 2 Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles (yha)
September 28, 2020 Filing 1 Petition (Complaint) to Compel Arbitration. Filing fee $400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13596204, filed by Christopher Dweck. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Collective Bargaining Agreement)(Ohanian, Sebastian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dweck v. City of Miami Springs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Dweck
Represented By: Sebastian Ohanian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Miami Springs
Represented By: Jonathan Howard Railey
Represented By: Christopher J. Stearns, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida State Lodge Fraternal Order of Police, Inc.
Represented By: Paul A. Daragjati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?