Nottage v. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Danielle Nottage
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2020cv24010
Filed: September 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Becerra
Referring Judge: James Lawrence King
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:0205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security served on 11/18/2020, answer due 1/19/2021. (cds)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS SCHEDULING ORDER. THIS CAUSE has been referred to the undersigned Magistrate Judge pursuant to the administrative procedures of the Court which govern the disposition of Social Security cases, ECF No. 2 . In order to ensure the orderly and efficient disposition of this matter the Court hereby ORDERS the following Scheduling Order: (1) Plaintiff shall file a motion for summary judgment, setting forth the reasons for relief and including citations to the administrative record and relevant legal authorities, within thirty (30) days from the date that Defendant files an answer and the administrative record of the proceedings. (2) Defendant shall file a response to Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment and Defendant's cross-motion for summary judgment within thirty (30) days after Plaintiff files the motion for summary judgment. (3) Plaintiff may respond to Defendant's motion for summary judgment and file a reply in support of Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment within fifteen (15) days after Defendant files the response and motion as set forth above. Notwithstanding Local Rule 56.1, Plaintiff is not required to file a separate statement of facts nor does the factual recitation in the motion need to be in separately-numbered paragraphs. However, all factual assertions must include specific page citations from the Administrative Record using the number provided by the ECF system on the top right corner of the page. Non-compliance with any provision of this Order may subject the offending party and its attorney(s) to sanctions, including dismissal of claims or striking of defenses. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra on 11/19/2020. (bpt)
October 30, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Compliance re #7 Preparing Packet for service by the Marshal (jbs)
October 30, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s))(jbs)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #3 PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. USM Service ordered. Summonses provided for issuance by Clerk for USM Service Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Danielle Nottage. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra on 10/29/2020. See attached document for full details. (jbs)
October 5, 2020 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has not updated address and/or email information for attorney Tod William Read re #5 Notice of Change of Address. Attorney Tod William Read has not followed the required procedures for updating their information with the Court. Attorney is instructed to go to their PACER account, Manage My Account, to complete the process of updating their information. The Court is NOT responsible for updating secondary email addresses. See the Courts website for detailed instructions. #www.flsd.uscourts.gov/updating-your-information (pt)
October 2, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address by Tod William Read (Read, Tod)
October 1, 2020 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. The motion to proceed in forma pauperis is pending (jbs)
September 30, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Danielle Nottage. (jbs)
September 30, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge James Lawrence King and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pursuant to the Clerks directive of this cause, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jbs)
September 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR REVERSAL OF THE COMMISSIONERS FINAL DECISION against Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security. Filing fees $ 400.00. IFP Filed, filed by Danielle Nottage. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs, #3 Assignment of EAJA Fees, #4 Summon(s) ANDREW M. SAUL, #5 Summon(s) ARIANA FAJARDO ORSHAN, #6 Summon(s) WILLIAM BARR)Case restricted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2. (Read, Tod)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nottage v. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Nottage
Represented By: Tod William Read
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?